Specialty Surfaces International, Inc. v. Deluxe Athletics, LLC et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Leigh Martin May |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00292 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 28, 2015 9:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Paulding County School District
|
|
Plaintiff
Specialty Surfaces International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
Deluxe Athletics, LLC
Terminated: 05/14/2015
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Specialty Surfaces International, Inc.
Terminated: 05/14/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deluxe Athletics, LLC
Terminated: 05/14/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Thu 05/14 10:53 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING14 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Deluxe Athletics, LLC, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (ddm) |
||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Thu 05/14 10:56 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to Paulding County School District pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (ddm) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 05/14 10:57 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) |
||
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 05/13 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Specialty Surfaces International, Inc. (Fry, John) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 05/13 5:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Deluxe Athletics, LLC, Specialty Surfaces International, Inc.. (Fry, John) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 05/11 9:08 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time through 5/21/15 for plaintiff to answer counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/8/15. (jpa) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/07 2:47 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaims re:11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Specialty Surfaces International, Inc..(Fry, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 04/13 4:59 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 1/8/2016.), COUNTERCLAIM against Specialty Surfaces International, Inc. with Jury Demand by Deluxe Athletics, LLC.(Coleman, Ronald) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/06 8:55 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deluxe Athletics, LLC's Answer is due 4/13/2015. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 04/03/2015. (rvb) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/03 8:37 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Deluxe Athletics, LLC. (Coleman, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/02 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Rene Johnson on behalf of Deluxe Athletics, LLC (Johnson, Tiffany) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/02 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr on behalf of Deluxe Athletics, LLC (Coleman, Ronald) |
|
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Mon 02/02 2:08 PM
STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation in cases proceeding before Judge May. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/2/15. (ddm) |
|
5 | 5
misc
A.O. Form 120
Mon 02/02 10:53 AM
--CORRECT PDF-- AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop) |
|
4 | 4
misc
A.O. Form 120
Mon 02/02 10:35 AM
--WRONG PDF ATTACHED -- AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop) Modified on 2/2/2015 (eop) |
|
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Mon 02/02 8:45 AM
Clerks Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) |
||
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 01/30 4:32 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Deluxe Athletics, LLC and Paulding County School District.(eop) |
|
Att: 1 Paulding County School | ||
Thursday, January 29, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 01/30 4:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialty Surfaces International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent, ITS-Sprinturf Holdings, LLC for Specialty Surfaces International, Inc.. (eop) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/30 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Specialty Surfaces International, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-5631421.)(eop) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. - A, | ||
Att: 2 Ex. - B, | ||
Att: 3 Ex. - C, | ||
Att: 4 Ex. - D, | ||
Att: 5 Ex. - E, | ||
Att: 6 Ex - F, | ||
Att: 7 Ex. - G, | ||
Att: 8 Ex. - H, | ||
Att: 9 Ex. - I, | ||
Att: 10 Ex. - J, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet |