The Commercial Bank of Ozark v. Pearson et al (JOINT ASSIGN)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William Keith Watkins |
Referred: | Susan Russ Walker |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00073 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 27, 2015 7:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Clarissa Pearson
PO Box 672
Ariton, AL 36311 |
|
Defendant
Lorenzo Pearson
PO Box 672
Ariton, AL 36311 |
|
Plaintiff
The Commercial Bank of Ozark
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 05/21 2:13 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable.19 Order mailed to Clarissa Pearson returned by USPS with the following notation, "Box Closed, Return to Sender, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (NO PDF) |
||
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/11 10:52 AM
ORDER: The parties are notified that the attached order has been filed in Pearson v. The Commercial Bank of Ozark, Case No. 1:17-CV-687-WKW. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/11/2018.(dmn, ) (Main Document 19 replaced on 5/11/2018 to remove the Exhibit/Attachment included in the main document pdf, which was a duplicate of the current attachment; attached twice in error.) (dmn, ) Modified on 5/11/2018. (dmn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Order entered in Case No. 1:17-CV-687-WKW | ||
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Entry of Dismissal
Fri 04/29 10:17 AM
Entry of Dismissal issued as the MANDATE of USCA as to13 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarissa Pearson, Lorenzo Pearson, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-12790 B;Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellants Clarissa Pearson and Lorenzo Pearson have failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules, effective April 29, 2016. FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION(ydw, ) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 03/22 5:05 PM
ORDER of USCA as to13 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarissa Pearson, Lorenzo Pearson, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-12790 B: The Pearsons' motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED because the appeal is frivolous as further set out in the order. See Pace v. Evans 709 F.2d 1428(11th Cir. 1983). (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Thu 07/02 10:23 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:13 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 15-12790 B. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (ydw, ) |
||
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 06/24 2:35 PM
USCA Case Number 15-12790 B for13 Notice of Appeal filed by Clarissa Pearson, Lorenzo Pearson. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. (ydw, ) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/24 11:06 AM
ORDER before the court is Defendants Notice of Appeal and Motion to Stay State Proceedings, which the court construes as containing a motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. (Doc. # 13) as further set out in order; Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendants motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (Doc. # 13) is DENIED, and that the appeal in this cause is hereby certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 1915(a), as not taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 06/24/2014. (ydw, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 06/23 1:49 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal,3 MOTION to Remand,4 MOTION Prohibit Lorenzo Pearson and Clarissa Pearson from Filing Future Filings and Proceedings Without Prior Court Approval,11 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,12 Order, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 13] Notice of Appeal.(ydw, ) |
|
Att: 1 APPEAL PACKAGE | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 06/23 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Clarissa Pearson, Lorenzo Pearson as to11 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, and12 Order, entered on 06/10/2015.(ydw) |
|
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/23 12:01 PM
13 NOTICE OF APPEAL containing a MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Clarissa Pearson, Lorenzo Pearson. No PDF with this docket entry. (ydw, ) |
||
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 06/10 12:31 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's3 motion to remand is GRANTED and that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for Dale County, Alabama. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to take the necessary steps to effectuate the remand. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's4 motion for an order is GRANTED. Defendants are ENJOINED from filing future notices of removal or direct suits in this court against Plaintiff or its agents, servants, employees, officers, or directors, unless Defendants comply with the following procedures: If Lorenzo Pearson or Clarissa Pearson wishes to file any notice of removal or a direct suit in this district in which Plaintiff, The Commercial Bank of Ozark, or any of its agents, servants, employees, officers, or directors, is a party, they must submit a petition for leave to file, along with a proposed notice of removal or complaint and a copy of this Order, to this court for consideration. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to forward to the undersigned any such petition and its accompanying documents for consideration. The Clerk of the Court shall not docket or open a new case until this court issues an order to do so. If Lorenzo Pearson or Clarissa Pearson fails to comply with the courts directive by submitting a notice of removal or complaint involving The Commercial Bank of Ozark, or any of its agents, servants, employees, officers, or directors, without complying with this Order, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to return the notice of removal or complaint to him or her. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/10/2015. (kh, ) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 06/10 12:23 PM
ORDERED that Defendants'10 motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/10/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/05 1:48 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Commercial Bank of Ozark re8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement (Cotter, Ross) Modified on 5/5/2015 to add the docket entry relationship(kh, ) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement
Tue 05/05 9:09 AM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to The Commercial Bank of Ozark Corporate Disclosures due by 5/15/2015.(kh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate/Conflict Attachment | ||
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 04/20 1:46 PM
ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate the pending2 motion for clarification. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/20/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition
Thu 03/12 12:07 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re3 MOTION to Remand filed by Clarissa Pearson, Lorenzo Pearson. (wcl, ) |
|
Friday, February 20, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 02/20 3:33 PM
BRIEFING ORDER that the3 MOTION to Remand be submitted without oral argument on March 20, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the Defendants file a response, which shall include a brief, on or before March 13, 2015. The Plaintiff may file a reply brief on or before March 20, 2015; as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/20/2015. (kh, ) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 02/20 12:04 PM
MOTION Prohibit Lorenzo Pearson and Clarissa Pearson from Filing Future Filings and Proceedings Without Prior Court Approval by The Commercial Bank of Ozark.(Cotter, Ross) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
3 | 3
motion
Remand
Fri 02/20 11:56 AM
MOTION to Remand by The Commercial Bank of Ozark. (Cotter, Ross) |
|
Friday, February 06, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Clarify
Fri 02/06 3:57 PM
MOTION for Clarification by Clarissa Pearson, Lorenzo Pearson.(wcl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments | ||
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/30 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clarissa Pearson, Lorenzo Pearson from Circuit Court of Dale County, Alabama, case number 26-CV-14-900012.00. (No filing fee, No IFP Rec'd)(wcl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments |