Alexander v. Dutton
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | William G Cobb |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00074 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
Order on Mandate
Thu 07/20 2:22 PM
ORDER ON MANDATE as to ECF No.43 USCA Mandate. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/20/2017. USCA case 17-15529 . (DRM) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 06/26 7:54 AM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to ECF No.37 Notice of Appeal : Appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate. USCA case 17-15529 . (DRM) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 05/18 12:33 PM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to ECF No.37 Notice of Appeal : Appellant shall pay $505 filing fee to USDC by 6/8/2017. USCA case 17-15529 . (DRM) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Transcript Designation
Fri 03/31 2:18 PM
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander re ECF No.37 Notice of Appeal. Transcripts are NOT required for this appeal. (KR) |
|
40 | 40
appeal
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal
Fri 03/31 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal, filed by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. (E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.) (KR) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
Transcript Designation and Transcript Order forms
Fri 03/24 8:32 AM
FORM - Designation of Transcripts for ECF No.37 Notice of Appeal. Forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx] . (KR) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 03/23 2:38 PM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to ECF No.37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Demetri Alexander. USCA Case Number 17-15529 . (KW) |
|
37 | 37
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 03/23 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to ECF Nos.35 Order Dismissing Case and36 Judgment by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander (Filing fee $ 505 NOT PAID ). (Notice of Appeal NEF and PACER docket sheet sent to P). E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (KW) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Judgment
Fri 03/17 10:16 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
35 | 35
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/17 10:11 AM
ORDER - The Report and Recommendation (ECF No.31 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.19 ) is granted. Defendant's motion for extension of time (ECF No.33 ) is granted nunc pro tunc . Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt of Court (ECF No.30 ) is denied. Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 02/02 6:03 PM
RESPONSE to Objection to31 Report and Recommendation by Defendant Gary Dutton.(Hardcastle, Gerri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Thu 01/26 3:36 PM
First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (First Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Objections to R&R by Defendant Gary Dutton. (Hardcastle, Gerri) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 01/12 11:17 AM
OBJECTION to ECF No.31 Report and Recommendation, by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. Response to Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2017. (KW) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 01/03 1:12 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Defendant's ECF No.19 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted, and that Plaintiff's ECF No.30 Motion for Contempt of Court be denied. Objections to R&R due by 1/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/30 11:27 AM
MOTION for Contempt of Court, by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. Responses due by 1/13/2017. (KR) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation
Mon 12/19 5:56 PM
RESPONSE to Objection to23 Report and Recommendation by Defendant Gary Dutton.(Hardcastle, Gerri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 12/05 1:06 PM
OPPOSITION to ECF No.19 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. Replies due by 12/22/2016. (KR) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/22 3:36 PM
ORDER - The Court WITHDRAWS its report and recommendation(ECF No.23 ). Plaintiff has TWENTY-ONE days from the date of this Order to file and serve his response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment (ECF No.19 ). The Clerk shall SEND Plaintiff a copy of Defendant's motion for summary judgment and accompanying exhibits along with a copy of this order. (Mailed 11/22/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation
Mon 09/19 2:39 PM
RESPONSE to Objection to23 Report and Recommendation Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation by Defendant Gary Dutton. (Hardcastle, Gerri) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Fri 09/09 12:04 PM
OBJECTION to ECF No.23 Report and Recommendation, by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. Response to Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2016. (KR) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/01 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gerri L Hardcastle on behalf of Defendant Gary Dutton. Defense Counsel's Notice of Appearance (Hardcastle, Gerri) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 08/31 11:30 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - recommend ECF No.19 Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED , and summary judgment be entered in Defendant's favor. Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 08/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 03/24 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address, by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. Old: High Desert. New: Southern Desert. (KR) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/14 9:29 AM
ORDER - #5 IFP Application is GRANTED. NDOC shall pay clerk from inmate account Clerk shall SEND this Order to Finance, and to NDOC Inmate Services. ( Emailed NEF to Finance, and Order mailed to NDOC on 3/14/2016. ) Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Klingele Minute Order - FORM
Fri 03/11 7:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 03/10 10:42 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Gary Dutton. Responses due by 4/3/2016.(Ward, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3 | ||
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/09 1:44 PM
STATUS REPORT Report of the Office of the Attorney General Re: Results of the 90-Day Stay by Defendant Gary Dutton. (Ward, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Early Mediation Conference
Tue 03/01 4:11 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Mediation Conference held on 3/1/2016 before Mediator Chandeni Sendall, Esq. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden ; Pla Counsel: Demetri Alexander, In Pro Per (via video) ; Def Counsel: John Ward ; FTR #: FTR ; Time of Hearing: 1:29:50 p.m. - 1:30:19 p.m. ; EMC Ended: 3:20 p.m. ; Courtroom: 2 . 1st mediation session. A settlement was NOT reached. The recording of this report of mediation is SEALED. An early mediation program questionnaire for Plaintiff to complete has been mailed to the Plaintiff along with a copy of these minutes. The questionnaire should be completed and returned to Judicial Assistant, at 400 South Virginia Street, Suite 404, Reno, Nevada 89501 within thirty (30) days. DO NOT FILE THE QUESTIONNAIRE. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Scheduling Inmate Early Mediation Conference
Tue 02/02 10:57 AM
ORDER Scheduling Inmate Early Mediation Conference. An Inmate Early Mediation Conference is set for 3/1/2016 at 1:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 2 before Mediator Chandeni Sendall. The Office of the Attorney General is directed to make the necessary arrangements for plaintiff's appearance via video and shall notify Katie Lynn Ogden at 775-686-5758 with the video conference reservation number and telephone number at which the plaintiff can be reached for the early mediation conference. The mediation statements shall be received by chambers at 400 S. Virginia Street, Suite 405, Reno, NV 89501 no later than 2/23/16 at 4:00 p.m. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) |
|
Thursday, December 31, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/31 8:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John L Ward on behalf of Defendant Gary Dutton. Notice of Limited Appearance for the Purposes of Settlement Discussions During the 90-Day Stay (Ward, John) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Screening Order
Thu 12/10 10:32 AM
SCREENING ORDER. Decision on5 IFP application is deferred. Count I shall proceed. Motion to strike10 is denied as moot. Motions for status check11 and13 are denied as moot. This action is stayed 90 days to allow opportunity to settle. 90-day stay report due 3/9/2016. Clerk shall electronically serve copy of this order and copy of9 amended complaint on AG's Office (served via NEF 12/10/15). AG's Office shall advise Court within 21 days whether it will enter notice of appearance for purpose of settlement. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/10/15. (copy of complaint sent to P) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 11/19 3:10 PM
MOTION for Status Check by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. (JC) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 09/14 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. Old address NNCC. New address HDSP. (Clerk terminated E-service via NNCC law library.) (DRM) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/15 3:04 PM
MOTION for Status Check, by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. Responses due by 8/1/2015. (KR) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Strike
Thu 06/04 7:44 AM
F.R.C.P. Rule 12.(F)(2) MOTION to Strike, by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. Responses due by 6/20/2015. (KR) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 06/01 10:16 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Gary Dutton, filed by Demetri Alexander. No changes to parties. (JC) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/27 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT, by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander, filed and dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend, per 7 Screening Order. (KR) |
|
7 | 7
order
Screening Order
Wed 05/27 3:18 PM
SCREENING ORDER deferring decision on5 IFP application; directing Clerk to file the1 -1 complaint; dismissing complaint in its entirety, without prejudice, with leave to amend; giving Plaintiff 30 days to file an amended complaint; directing Clerk to send Plaintiff 1983 form, instructions, and a copy of his complaint (mailed 5/27/2015); denying as moot 6 motion for status check. Amended Complaint deadline: 6/26/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/03 8:45 AM
MOTION for Status Check by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander. (JC) |
|
Tuesday, February 10, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/10 4:40 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (DRM) |
|
Wednesday, February 04, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Transmittal
Wed 02/04 11:40 AM
TRANSMITTAL from USDC to NNCC of IFP form and instructions for distribution to Plaintiff re 3 Order. (KR) |
|
Att: 1 IFP instructions | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/04 11:38 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 1 IFP application; directing Clerk to send IFP form and instructions to Plaintiff (transmitted 2/4/2015). Filing fee of $400 or fully complete IFP application due within 30 days (by 3/6/2015). The Clerk shall retain the1 -1 complaint but not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Prisoner re case received & number assigned - FORM
Tue 02/03 11:45 AM
NOTICE to Plaintiff from USDC advising case against defendant Dutton, et al. has been received and assigned case number 3:15-cv-00074 . (Inmate # * 79399 * ) (DRM) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/03 11:44 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Demetri Alexander.(DRM) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 02/03 12:02 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) |