Horne v. WeighPack Systems West, Inc.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William B Shubb |
Referred: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00178 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 02, 2015 4:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
WeighPack Systems West, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Horne
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/17 12:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed 4/17/2015, and hereby orders this civil action terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 04/17 12:04 PM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Marvin Horne. (Krbechek, Randolf) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 03/26 12:37 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER15 for extension of time signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/25/2016. Defendant may have up to and including 4/27/2015 to respond to plaintiff's1 Complaint. (Marciel, M) |
|
Wednesday, March 25, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 03/25 11:27 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER extending time to respond to Complaint by WeighPack Systems West, Inc.. (Gamlen, Tod) Modified on 3/26/2015 (Marciel, M) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/10 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Marvin Horne re13 Civil New Case Documents for WBS,. (Krbechek, Randolf) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Civil New Case Documents for WBS
Fri 03/06 3:17 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Pursuant to the Clerk's Notice of Reassignment of this action to Senior Judge William B. Shubb issued 3/6/2015 (Docket No. 12), the Initial Scheduling Conference is reset for 6/22/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 6/8/2015, in accordance with the attached order. (Kirksey Smith, K) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 03/06 3:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is 1:15-cv-00178-WBS-BAM. (Marrujo, C) |
|
11 | 11
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 03/06 12:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER ***TEXT Only***: In light of the status of this case with a Sacramento District Judge being assigned as presiding Judge, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for May 5, 2015 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe is VACATED . signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/36/2015. (Herman, H) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minute Order
Fri 03/06 12:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER ***TEXT Only***: The Court has reviewed the pending case and determines this case is at an appropriate stage to assign a District Judge. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign a Sacramento District Judge. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/6/2015. (Herman, H) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/05 2:47 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by WeighPack Systems West, Inc.. (Gamlen, Tod) |
|
Wednesday, February 25, 2015 | ||
8 | 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: (Krbechek, Randolf) | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: WeighPack Systems West, Inc. served on 2/10/2015, answer due 3/3/2015. (Krbechek, Randolf) | |
Tuesday, February 24, 2015 | ||
6 | 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, up to and including 3/27/2015 by WeighPack Systems West, Inc.. Attorney Gamlen, Tod L. added. (Gamlen, Tod) | |
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *WeighPack Systems West, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Randolf Krbechek* *Law Offices of Randolf Krbechek* *9477 N. Fort Washington Road, Suite 104* *Fresno, CA 93730*. (Fahrney, E) | |
4 | 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Status Conference re Consent / Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Fahrney, E) | |
Att: 1 Order Assigning Action to Sac DJ, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
3 | 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marvin Horne (Krbechek, Randolf) | |
2 | 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Randolf Krbechek re1 Complaint: Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Hellings, J) | |
1 | 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT for Damages and Rescission against All Defendants by Marvin Horne. Attorney Krbechek, Randolf added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-5727603) (Krbechek, Randolf) |