Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund et al v. ACR Glazing Contractors, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00548 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 03, 2015 7:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
ACR Glazing Contractors, Inc. dba A C R Glass And Doors
|
|
Defendant
ACR Glazing Contractors, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Marian Bourboulis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Christophersen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
I.U.P.A.T. Union And Industry National Pension Fund; its Joint Board of Trustees; And Kenneth Rigmaiden, as Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Maggiore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees; Chris Christophersen and Alfred (Skip) Weltz, as Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees; Chris Christophersen and Alfred (Skip) Weltz, as Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred (Skip) Weltz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 05, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/05 5:07 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T. Union And Industry National Pension Fund; its Joint Board of Trustees; And Kenneth Rigmaiden, as Trustee, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees; Chris Christophersen and Alfred (Skip) Weltz, as Trustees, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees; Chris Christophersen and Alfred (Skip) Weltz, as Trustees, Alfred (Skip) Weltz.. (Canzoneri, Adrian) (Filed on 2/5/2015) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/05 4:30 PM
Summons Issued as to ACR Glazing Contractors, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 02/05 4:26 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 02/05 12:05 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015) |
|
Wednesday, February 04, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 02/04 4:56 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T. Union And Industry National Pension Fund; its Joint Board of Trustees; And Kenneth Rigmaiden, as Trustee, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees; Chris Christophersen and Alfred (Skip) Weltz, as Trustees, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees; Chris Christophersen and Alfred (Skip) Weltz, as Trustees re1 Complaint,,,, (Canzoneri, Adrian) (Filed on 2/4/2015) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 02/04 4:54 PM
Proposed Summons. (Canzoneri, Adrian) (Filed on 2/4/2015) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/04 4:52 PM
COMPLAINT against ACR Glazing Contractors, Inc. dba A C R Glass And Doors ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9263769.). Filed byDistrict Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees, Chris Christophersen, I.U.P.A.T. Union And Industry National Pension Fund; its Joint Board of Trustees; And Kenneth Rigmaiden, as Trustee, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees; Chris Christophersen and Alfred (Skip) Weltz, as Trustees, Marian Bourboulis, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund; and its Joint Boards of Trustees; Chris Christophersen and Alfred (Skip) Weltz, as Trustees, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades.(Canzoneri, Adrian) (Filed on 2/4/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |