K-BEECH, INC. v. BOOTH, ETAL
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Faith S Hochberg |
Referred: | Patty Shwartz |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-04776 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2011 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2012 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2017 8:12 PM EST |
Defendant
Richard Booth
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 33
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephanie Gillock
|
|
Defendant
Daffney Pierce
|
|
Plaintiff
K-BEECH, INC.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JOHN DOE 5
Terminated: 01/11/2012
Tini Thomas, Esq. 510 Alexander Avenue
Linden, NJ 07036 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 20
Terminated: 01/22/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe 30
Terminated: 01/25/2012
2 Sheppard Road, Suite 603
Voorhees, NJ 08043 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE 2
Terminated: 01/11/2012
P.O. BOX 5336
CLARK, NJ 07066 |
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE 20
Terminated: 01/11/2012
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE 30
Terminated: 01/11/2012
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE 33
Terminated: 01/11/2012
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-39
Terminated: 01/11/2012
|
Docket last updated: 08/17/2011 8:00 PM EDT |