USA v. Sarao
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:15-cr-00075 |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2017 11:09 AM CST |
Defendant
Navinder Singh Sarao (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
1. | How the Flash Crash Trader Lost His $50 Million Fortune (bloomberg.com) |
Submitted Fri 02/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 03/11/2020 10:04 AM CDT |
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 35 pgs COMPLAINT signed by Honorable Daniel G. Martin as to Navinder Singh Sarao (1) (yap, ) | |
2 | 2 MOTION by USA to seal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrant as to Navinder Singh Sarao (yap, ) | |
3 | 3 ORDER as to Navinder Singh Sarao (1): Warrant for arrest issued to F.B.I. agent; as to Navinder Sign Sarao. Enter Order granting Government's motion to seal complaint, affidavit and arrest warrant2 . Signed by the Honorable Daniel G. Martin on 2/11/2015. (yap, ) | |
4 | 4 ORDER as to Navinder Singh Sarao Signed by the Honorable Daniel G. Martin on 2/11/2015. (yap, ) |