Jackson v. Triumph Aerostructures, LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00535 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 15, 2015 9:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Triumph Aerostructures, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, November 11, 2016 | ||
49 | 49
misc
Stipulation
Fri 11/11 3:13 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Triumph Aerostructures LLC. (Tall, Vicki) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 11/14 8:21 AM
Civil Case Terminated per49 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (trk) |
||
Sunday, November 06, 2016 | ||
48 | 48
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
Sun 11/06 6:05 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting47 Motion to Extend Time. The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Deadline for parties to file joint stipulation of dismissal or proposed final judgment is now November 11, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/6/2016) (chmb) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
47 | 47
motion
Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 11/04 4:43 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time Deadline(), Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Triumph Aerostructures LLC (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
46 | 46
order
Order
Wed 10/26 3:42 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court has received notice that this case has settled. In light of that, the Court ORDERS the parties to submit a joint stipulation of dismissal or proposed final judgment no later than November 4, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/26/2016) (chmb) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
45 | 45
respm
Sur-reply
Mon 09/26 6:00 PM
Sur-reply filed by Bobby Jackson re:37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment ,18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Smith, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
44 | 44
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 09/13 11:15 AM
Supplemental Appendix in Support filed by Triumph Aerostructures LLC re33 Reply. (twd) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
5
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List)
Tue 09/13 11:12 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's35 Motion to Strike Appendix in Support of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's18 Motion for Summary Judgment, but GRANTS Defendant's37 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in Support of its18 Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply Brief. The Court directs the clerk to enter Defendant's34 Supplemental Appendix as of the date of this Order. And the Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a sur-reply no later than 9/27/2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/12/2016) (twd) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order For ADR
Fri 07/29 1:05 PM
MEDIATION ORDER: The court appoints Michael H. Bassett as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/4/2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/29/2016) (ran) |
|
41 | 41
order
Order
Fri 07/29 11:51 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court hereby RESETS the trial date in this case to February 6, 2017. The remaining pretrial deadlines are reset as follows: pretrial disclosures are due on or before December 23, 2016; objections to pretrial disclosures are due on or before January 6, 2017; pretrial materials (including the pretrial order) are due on or before January 24, 2017; pretrial conference will be held on February 3, 2017, at 10:00 am. The new trial date is a special setting and will not be reset. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/29/2016) (chmb) |
|
utility
Modify Hearings/Deadlines
Mon 08/01 9:22 AM
Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadlines/hearings reset per 41 Order,,. Pretrial Materials due by 1/24/2017. Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2017. Trial set for 2/6/2017 before Judge Jane J Boyle. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (mem) |
||
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/28 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Agreed Trial Date and Mediator re: 39 Order, filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC (Turner, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order
Thu 07/14 3:22 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court hereby VACATES the trial date in this case and ORDERS the parties to submit, on or before July 28, 2016, a new, mutually agreeable trial date. The Court also ORDERS the parties to submit the name of an agreed-upon mediator by the same date. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/14/2016) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Reply
Wed 07/06 4:27 PM
REPLY filed by Bobby Jackson re:37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment ,35 MOTION to Strike34 Appendix in Support of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Smith, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Leave to File
Wed 06/22 4:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Appendix in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply Brief | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 06/22 4:07 PM
RESPONSE filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC re:35 MOTION to Strike34 Appendix in Support of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Strike
Wed 06/01 2:01 PM
MOTION to Strike34 Appendix in Support of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Jackson (Smith, Jason) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 05/20 6:06 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC re33 Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Supp. App. 1-3 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply
Fri 05/20 6:04 PM
REPLY filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC re:18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 05/06 6:27 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Bobby Jackson re31 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,30 Response/Objection to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Smith, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) | ||
31 | 31
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 05/06 6:19 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bobby Jackson re30 Response/Objection to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Smith, Jason) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 05/06 6:17 PM
RESPONSE filed by Bobby Jackson re:18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Smith, Jason) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Mon 05/02 5:11 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court hereby ADOPTS the Amended Scheduling Order issued in this case (Doc. 11). (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/2/2016) (chmb) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 04/29 10:13 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting27 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Unopposed Third Motion to Extend Time to File Response and Brief to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file his response on or before May 6, 2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 4/29/2016) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/28 2:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 25 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply,18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Jackson (Smith, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 04/28 12:26 PM
SPECIAL ORDER NO. 3-304: Case reassigned to Judge Jane J Boyle for all further proceedings. Judge Jorge A Solis no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/26/2016) (ran) |
|
Sunday, April 24, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Sun 04/24 9:08 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting24 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 4/29/2016 (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/24/2016) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/21 5:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 23 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply,18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Jackson (Smith, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/19 5:29 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting21 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to18 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court extends the deadline for filing that response to April 22, 2016. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/19/2016) (chmb) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 04/19 5:26 PM
ORDER denying12 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 4/19/2016) (chmb) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/18 11:13 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bobby Jackson (Smith, Jason) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 03/31 7:36 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC re19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - App 1-38, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - App 39-46, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3 - App 47-52, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4 - App 53-54, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5 - App 55 | ||
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 03/30 11:59 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC re18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Tall, Vicki) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 03/30 11:58 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Settlement Conference Report
Mon 03/14 5:20 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Bobby Jackson, Triumph Aerostructures, LLC. (Turner, Andrew) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 03/14 11:16 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC re15 Response/Objection (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - App. 1-3, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - App. 4-17, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3 - App. 18-37, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4 - App. 38-53, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5 - App. 54-69, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6 - App. 70-72, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7 - App. 73-79, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 8 - App. 80-85, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 9 - App. 86, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 10 - App. 87-93 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 03/14 11:08 AM
RESPONSE filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC re:12 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Pleading (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 02/22 3:21 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Bobby Jackson re13 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,12 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Pleading (Smith, Jason) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 02/22 3:20 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bobby Jackson re12 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Pleading (Smith, Jason) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File
Mon 02/22 3:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amend Pleading filed by Bobby Jackson (Smith, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 11/24 12:07 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The JURY TRIAL is scheduled on this Court's two-week docket beginning 8/1/2016 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Jorge A Solis. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2016 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Jorge A Solis. Discovery due by 2/29/2016. Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2016. Motions due by 3/30/2016. Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2016. Pretrial Materials due by 7/18/2016. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 11/24/2015) (ndt) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Continue
Mon 11/23 3:38 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue filed by Bobby Jackson, Triumph Aerostructures, LLC (Tall, Vicki) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
trial
Designation of Experts
Mon 08/31 3:01 PM
Designation of Experts by Bobby Jackson. (Smith, Jason) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/12 9:46 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The JURY TRIAL is scheduled on this Court's two-week docket beginning 4/4/2016 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Jorge A Solis. Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2016 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Jorge A Solis. Joinder of Parties due by 7/13/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2015. Discovery due by 11/23/2015. Status Report due by 12/7/2015. Motions due by 12/23/2015. Pretrial Order due by 3/11/2016. Pretrial Materials due by 3/23/2016. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 5/11/2015) (skt) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/06 4:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bobby Jackson. (Smith, Jason) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order
Thu 04/23 5:39 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Bobby Jackson. (Smith, Jason) |
|
Sunday, March 22, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Sun 03/22 4:59 PM
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/22/2015. (Ordered by Chief Judge Jorge A Solis on 3/22/2015) (chmb) |
|
Friday, March 13, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 03/13 4:54 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bobby Jackson. (Smith, Jason) |
|
Monday, February 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Solis (Dallas)
Tue 02/17 9:51 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Solis. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/16 12:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Triumph Aerostructures Holdings, LLC for Triumph Aerostructures, LLC. (Turner, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 02/16 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 68th Judicial District, case number DC 15-00275 filed by Triumph Aerostructures, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-6603316) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Turner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Documents Filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |