Brightbill et al v. General Motors Corporation et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Samuel Conti |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00741 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 16, 2015 5:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORTATION
|
|
Defendant
TAKATA
|
|
Defendant
General Motors, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Takata Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
JOEL BRIGHTBILL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PATRICA PAYEUR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Brightbill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Payeur
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
General Motors Corporation
Terminated: 03/26/2015
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Relating Case
Tue 10/27 11:58 AM
ORDER RELATING CASES C15-0741 SC AND C15-3789 TEH.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/26/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 10/05 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joel Brightbill, Patricia Payeur (Bonner, Charles) (Filed on 10/5/2015) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Wed 09/30 4:31 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case No. 15-cv-03789-TEH. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/30/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2015 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 04/15 2:24 PM
RECEIPT OF ELECTRONIC ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida as case 1:15-cv-21416. Re14 Order of Transfer (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015) |
||
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
Tue 04/14 1:02 PM
CONDITIONAL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. To the Southern District of Florida. IN RE: TAKATA AIRBAG PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. MDL No. 2599. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 04/13/15.(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015) |
|
Att: 1 MDL Cover Letter | ||
utility
Remark
Tue 04/14 1:06 PM
The United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re14 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015) |
||
Tuesday, March 31, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/31 7:27 AM
Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC, Takata Corporation. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 03/30 10:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 03/30 8:22 AM
Proposed Summons. (Bonner, Charles) (Filed on 3/30/2015) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/26 11:27 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byJoel Brightbill, Patricia Payeur. (Bonner, Charles) (Filed on 3/26/2015) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/23 11:12 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Samuel Conti for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/23/15. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015) |
|
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 03/23 10:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/23 9:47 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joel Brightbill, Patricia Payeur.. (Bonner, Charles) (Filed on 3/23/2015) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 03/10 10:37 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due March 23, 2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015) |
|
Wednesday, February 25, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/25 2:27 PM
Summons Issued as to General Motors Corporation, Takata Corp. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 02/25 9:48 AM
Proposed Summons. (Bonner, Charles) (Filed on 2/25/2015) |
|
Wednesday, February 18, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 02/18 9:49 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 02/18 8:15 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015) |
|
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
55
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/17 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9295052.). Filed byJOEL BRIGHTBILL, PATRICA PAYEUR.(Bonner, Charles) (Filed on 2/17/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |