Naumov v. McDaniel College, Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Jarrod Hazel |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-00482 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 18, 2015 9:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Roger Casey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeanine Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Martin Hill
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McDaniel College, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pavel Naumov
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Chairman of the Board of Trustees McDaniel College, Inc.
Terminated: 07/08/2015
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 31 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 3/31/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
136 | 136
misc
Clerk's Order Taxing Costs
Fri 03/16 1:45 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER re:130 Bill of Costs. Costs are denied as moot in light of the notice withdrawing the pending bill of costs. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2018 (decs, Deputy Clerk) |