Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, et al v King County
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Marsha J Pechman |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00284 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2015 7:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
King County, Washington
|
|
Defendant
King County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Morel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Morel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas E Hornish
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne J Hornish
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucretia Vanderwende
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish, Trustees
Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust 1237 EAST LAKE SAMMAMISH SHORE LN SE
Sammamish, WA 98075 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Neighbors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Neighbors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hebert Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elynne Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arul Menezes
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Sammamish Homeowners
Terminated: 08/14/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
88 | 88
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Wed 09/19 5:04 PM
MANDATE of USCA 16-35486 as to72 Notice of Appeal, filed by Eugene Morel, Barbara Neighbors, Tracy Neighbors, Lucretia Vanderwende, Thomas E. Hornish and Suzanne J. Hornish Joint Living Trust, Hebert Moore, Arul Menezes, Lake Sammamish 4257 LLC, Elizabeth Morel, Elynne Moore. The judgment of this Court, entered August 03, 2018, takes effect this date.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $261.28. AFFIRMED (CDA) |