Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc. v. Dolphin Forwarding, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert N Scola, Jr |
Referred: | Alicia M Otazo-Reyes |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-20818 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 46:0741 Shipping |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 26, 2015 9:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dolphin Forwarding, Inc.
a New Jersey corporation c/o Margaret White 51 Maple ST #142
Rockland, MA 02370 |
|
Garnishee
Bank of America NA
Haley & Jhones, PA 9100 S. Dadeland Suite1500, PMB No.:150048
Miami, FL 33156 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Thu 07/23 7:41 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Final Judgment in Garnishment. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/22/2015. (cqs) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Judgment
Tue 06/09 9:23 AM
MOTION for Judgment in Garnishment Against Garnishee Bank, Bank of America by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc..(Halley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/05 2:01 PM
NOTICE by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc. to Parties of Subpoena for Deposition and Duces Tecum (Halley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Subpoena | ||
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
service
Writ of Garnishment Returned
Wed 05/20 10:39 AM
Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed Date of Service 5/14/2015 as to Bank of America, Garnishee. (Halley, Thomas) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/18 10:24 AM
NOTICE by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc. re20 Answer to Writ of Garnishment of Right to Dissolve and Certificate of Service (Halley, Thomas) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
respoth
Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Fri 05/15 4:39 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment and Statutory Demand for Attorney Fee Deposit by Bank of America NA. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 6/8/2015.(Jhones, Ana) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Fri 05/15 10:39 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re18 Writ of Garnishment by Thomas Vincent Halley on behalf of Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc. (Halley, Thomas) |
|
18 | 18
order
Writ of Garnishment Issued
Fri 05/15 9:13 AM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee Bank of America in the amount of $ 81,180.00 re:14 Motion for Writ of Garnishment filed by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc.. (cqs) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order Striking
Fri 05/15 9:11 AM
ORDER STRIKING13 Motion to Vacate filed by Dolphin Forwarding, Inc. Motions terminated:13 MOTION to Vacate9 Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Dolphin Forwarding, Inc.. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/14/2015. (cqs) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/14 11:50 AM
NOTICE by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc. re11 Default Judgment, of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Halley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Subpoena | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/14 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Filing Affirmation For Issuance of Writ of Garnishment by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc. re14 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment (cqs) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Writ of Garnishment
Thu 05/14 9:43 AM
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc.. Responses due by 6/1/2015 (cqs) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Vacate
Fri 05/08 11:46 AM
MOTION to Vacate9 Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default by Dolphin Forwarding, Inc..(for image see DE#12) Responses due by 5/26/2015 (cqs) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/08 11:44 AM
NOTICE To Court Re: Default and Answer by Dolphin Forwarding, Inc. re6 Answer to Complaint (by Margaret White pro se) (cqs) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 04/29 3:06 PM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc. against Dolphin Forwarding, Inc. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/29/2015. (tpl) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 04/29 10:54 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc..(Halley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Rick Pimentel, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Thomas Halley, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default - FORM
Mon 04/27 8:39 AM
ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Dolphin Forwarding, Inc. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/27/2015. (cqs) |
|
Friday, April 24, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 04/24 11:24 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Dolphin Forwarding, Inc. by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc.. (Halley, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/23 4:12 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc.. Dolphin Forwarding, Inc. served on 4/2/2015, answer due 4/23/2015. (Halley, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/22 2:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Margaret White RE:Dolphin Forwarding by Dolphin Forwarding, Inc.. (cqs) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Judge
Wed 03/04 12:16 PM
ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters To the Magistrate Judge, REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/4/2015. (cqs) |
|
Friday, February 27, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/27 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Dolphin Forwarding, Inc. (vjk) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Fri 02/27 3:50 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (vjk) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Fri 02/27 3:49 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (vjk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/27 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Dolphin Forwarding, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7512965, filed by Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc..(Halley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Terms and Conditions, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |