Villareal v. San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc. d/b/a Med Mart
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Fred Biery |
Referred: | Pamela A Mathy |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-00155 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 26, 2015 10:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Villareal
5410 Fredericksburg Suite 109
San Antonio, TX 78229 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment
Wed 09/30 10:35 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (aej) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 09/30 10:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (aej) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Wed 09/30 9:21 AM
STIPULATION with Regard to Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice by Antonio Villareal. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Wed 09/30 10:35 AM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (aej) |
||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Tue 09/29 4:51 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (Stone, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
utility
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 09/22 12:43 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Mathy per Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (aej) |
||
utility
Notice of Correction
Tue 09/22 4:27 PM
Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT ENTRIES HAVE BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT DOCKETING ERROR*** re 22 Order, 21 Order. (aej) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 09/22 4:29 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (aej) |
||
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
adr
ADR Report - Other
Tue 09/08 1:33 PM
ADR Report Filed - by San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc.(Stone, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 07/15 4:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART16 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (aej) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice
Wed 07/15 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Vacation by San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc. (Stone, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 07/14 9:07 AM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Antonio Villareal, re16 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Defendant San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 07/13 4:03 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration by San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (Stone, Susan) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Fri 07/10 4:09 PM
Plaintiff seeks an order overruling defendant's objections to plaintiff's RFP 4, 5, 6, 8, 9, 13, 15, 16, 18, 19, 21, 22, and 23, an order requiring defendant to provide all responsive documents, and an award of $2,500 in attorneys' fees. Plaintiff has not filed an affidavit and other evidence to show it expended $2,500 in fees in connection with the filing of its motion. Plaintiff attached to its motion a copy of defendant's responses and objections to plaintiff's first requests for production. Defendant has not filed a response to plaintiff's motion to compel and the time for filing a response has expired. With respect to some RFPs at issue, (for example RFPs 4, 8, 9, and 18), although defendant may have raised objections, defendant also stated it was producing certain responsive documents. With respect to RFP 13, defendant did not provide a response. With respect to RFP 6, defendant apparently asserted it would not produce requested materials because "Plaintiff should already be in possession of" them (but cited no authority to show that plaintiff's request was not proper). With respect to RFPs 5, 15, 16, 19, 21, 22, and 23, defendant interposed objections and apparently declined to produce any responsive information in its possession, custody or control in reliance on its objections. But, again, defendant has presented no authority to show the RFPs are not proper. This order grants in part plaintiff's motion to compel and to the extent defendant has possession, custody or control of documents responsive to any RFP at issue that it has not produced, defendant must produce non-privileged documents on or before Tuesday, July 21, 2015; to the extent defendant wishes to withhold any information under a valid claim of privilege it must serve on plaintiff's counsel a privilege log that provides sufficient information about the information withheld to show why it can be subject to a good faith claim of privilege (and without disclosing the purportedly privileged information) on or before Tuesday, July 21, 2015. This order denies the portions of plaintiff's motion to compel that ask for an award of attorney's fees. Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART14 Motion to Compel entered by Judge Pamela A. Mathy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PMA) |
||
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/02 9:27 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Mathy. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Pamela A. Mathy. (aej) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Compel
Wed 07/01 11:31 AM
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Antonio Villareal. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Tue 05/26 4:20 PM
COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (sf) |
|
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/26 3:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/8/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2015, Discovery due by 9/28/2015, Joinder of Parties due by 7/13/2015, Motions due by 10/30/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (sf) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 05/22 9:21 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by Antonio Villareal. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/29 2:27 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Antonio Villareal. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency Notice
Wed 04/29 2:16 PM
***NOTIFIED COUNSEL TO SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE*** DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 7 Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge (sf) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 04/29 1:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Antonio Villareal. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/29 12:59 PM
***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE REQUIRED***NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Antonio Villareal. (Poncio, Adam) Modified on 4/29/2015 (sf) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Tue 04/28 10:33 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.Signed by Chief Judge Fred Biery. (sf) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/23 4:18 PM
Defendant's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Susan Leslie Stone added to party San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc.(pty:dft) by San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc..(Stone, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/04 1:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio Villareal. San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc. served on 3/3/2015, answer due 3/24/2015. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Friday, February 27, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/27 4:46 PM
Summons Issued as to San Antonio Extended Medical Care, Inc.. (aej) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 02/27 11:00 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Antonio Villareal. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/27 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7240485), filed by Antonio Villareal.(Poncio, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 02/27 3:35 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Fri 02/27 3:35 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mathy (aej) |