Miller v. Walther Productions, Inc. et al
West Virginia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Irene M Keeley |
Case #: | 1:11-cv-00151 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2011 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2017 2:02 AM EST |
Consol Plaintiff
Yen Ton
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Elizabeth Rose Doran
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
All Good Festival Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Walther Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Tim Walther
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Marvin's Mountaintop, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Marvin Huggins
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Event Staffing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Junipa Contento
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walther Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
All Good Festival Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tim Walther
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Junipa Contento
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marvin's Mountaintop, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marvin Huggins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Event Staffing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kim S Miller
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Frank Lynch
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Event Staffing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Claimant
James Tobin
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
National Event Services, Inc.
Terminated: 02/13/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
M & M Parking, Inc
Terminated: 01/29/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Clay Harlin Lewin
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Jim Tobin Productions
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Axis Security, Inc.
Terminated: 02/13/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
James Carrico
Terminated: 04/16/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Clay Harlin Lewin
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Axis Security, Inc.
Terminated: 01/11/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
National Event Services, Inc.
Terminated: 01/11/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Marvin's Mountaintop, LLC
Terminated: 02/15/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
M & M Parking, Inc.
Terminated: 01/11/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
James Tobin
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
M & M Parking, Inc
Terminated: 01/11/2013
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
James Carrico
Terminated: 04/16/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
All Good Festival Inc.
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Jim Tobin Productions
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Tim Walther
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Marvin Huggins
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Walther Productions, Inc.
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Event Staffing, Inc.
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Junipa Contento
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Tobin
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Event Services, Inc.
Terminated: 02/13/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Axis Security, Inc.
Terminated: 02/13/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M & M Parking, Inc
Terminated: 01/29/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clay Harlin Lewin
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jim Tobin Productions
Terminated: 09/10/2012
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Carrico
Terminated: 04/16/2012
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/22/2011 8:00 PM EDT |