Hudgins v. Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC et al.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Sally Shushan |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-02579 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2011 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2012 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2017 3:11 AM CST |
Defendant
Linda Wallace
|
|
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chandell Hudgins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Hudgins
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Unidentified Party
Terminated: 10/28/2011
|
Docket last updated: 10/12/2011 7:00 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 13, 2011 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 11-4143 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053L-3232601) filed by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC.(Teske, Christopher) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Helen G. Berrigan and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (jmd, ) |