REYNOLDS INNOVATIONS, INC. v. BLOOG, LLC, et al
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Eagles |
Referred: | P Trevor Sharp |
Case #: | 1:11-cv-00885 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Oct 21, 2011 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2012 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 2:45 PM EST |
Plaintiff
REYNOLDS INNOVATIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
BLOOG, LLC
Terminated: 01/04/2012
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL COUGHLIN
Terminated: 12/22/2011
|
|
Defendant
ANTOINETTE LANZA
Terminated: 11/28/2011
|
|
Defendant
WARREN VOGEL
Terminated: 12/22/2011
|