S2 Automation LLC v. Micron Technology Inc.
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | James O Browning |
Referred: | W Daniel Schneider |
Case #: | 1:11-cv-00884 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 03, 2011 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2012 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2017 11:10 PM MST |
Counter Claimant
Micron Semiconductor Israel, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
S2 Automation Israel, Ltd.
|
|
Counter Claimant
S2 Automation LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
S2 Automation, LLC
|
|
Counter Defendant
Yosef Astanovsky
|
|
Counter Defendant
Micron Semiconductor Israel, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
S2 Automation Israel, Ltd.
|
|
Counter Defendant
S2 Automation, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Micron Technology Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S2 Automation LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/02/2011 6:00 PM MDT |
Monday, October 03, 2011 | ||
Filing Fee Received: $ 350 receipt number 1084-2225023 re1 Complaint filed by S2 Automation LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Gutierrez, Alicia) | ||
U.S. Magistrate Judge William P Lynch and U.S. Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider assigned. (mr) | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Conversion, Misrepresentation and Unjust Enrichment against Micron Technology Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by S2 Automation LLC.(Gutierrez, Alicia) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge William P Lynch to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mr) |