Hein v. Advanced Pain Management Services, LLC et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Richard D Bennett |
Case #: | 1:11-cv-01807 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 31:3729 False Claims Act - Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2011 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 15, 2015 7:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Advanced Anesthesiology Associates, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Advanced Pain Management Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Muhammed Kahn
|
|
Defendant
Atif Malik
|
|
Defendant
Sandeep Sherlekar
|
|
Movant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Hein
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 02, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 MARGINAL ORDER granting23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 5/1/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Thursday, May 01, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Janet Hein (Nannis, Veronica) | |
Thursday, April 24, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 PAPERLESS ORDER Denying21 Application for Continuing Matter Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 04/24/2014. | |
Monday, July 08, 2013 | ||
21 | 21 Application for continuing the matter under seal by United States of America(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 09, 2013 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER granting19 Motion Application for continuing the matter under seal. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 5/7/2013. (C/S 5/9/2013 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Monday, May 06, 2013 | ||
19 | 19 Application for continuing the matter under seal by United States of America(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 11, 2013 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER granting17 Motion Application for continuing the matter under seal. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/11/13. (C/S 3/11/13 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Thursday, March 07, 2013 | ||
17 | 17 Application for continuing the matter under seal by United States of America(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 11, 2013 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER granting15 Application for continuing the matter under seal. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/8/2013. (c/m 2/11/2013 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Thursday, February 07, 2013 | ||
15 | 15 Application for continuing the matter under seal by United States of America(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in support, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Wednesday, January 09, 2013 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER re13 NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 1/8/2013. (c/s 1/9/2013 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Monday, January 07, 2013 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 07, 2012 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER granting11 MOTION for an Extension of Time to note its election on Intervention and Continuing the matter under seal. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 12/6/2012. (c/m 12/7/2012 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Thursday, December 06, 2012 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for an Extension of Time to note its election on Intervention and Continuing the matter under seal by United States of America.(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 04, 2012 | ||
10 | 10 4 pgs ORDER granting9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Intervene by United States of America. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 8/30/2012. (c/m 9/5/2012 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Monday, August 27, 2012 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Intervene by United States of America.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 01, 2012 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Intervene. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/1/2012. (c/s 3/2/2012 aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Friday, February 24, 2012 | ||
7 | 7 -SEALED-UNOPPOSED MOTION for an Extension of Time To consider election to Intervene and Continuing the matter under seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 07, 2011 | ||
6 | 6 Marginal ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 9/7/11. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) | |
5 | 5 ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Intervene. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 9/7/11. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) | |
Friday, August 05, 2011 | ||
4 | 4 -SEALED- UNOPPOSED MOTION for an Extension of Time To consider election to Intervene and Continuing the matter under seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 05, 2011 | ||
3 | 3 Correspondence regarding Jay P. Holland's appearance as Plaintiffs' counsel. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 7/5/11) | |
Thursday, June 30, 2011 | ||
2 | 2 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal Case by Janet Hein.(kns, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1 44 pgs COMPLAINT against Advanced Anesthesiology Associates, LLC, Advanced Pain Management Services, LLC, Muhammed Kahn, Atif Malik, Sandeep Sherlekar (Filing fee, $ 350 receipt number 84637017485) filed by Janet Hein.(kns, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Jury Trial Demand by Janet Hein. (kns, Deputy Clerk) |