AGNEW et al v. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Berman Jackson |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00340 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 05, 2015 9:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CATHY L. LANIER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DARYL THOMAS AGNEW
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RASHAD BUGG BEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALEX DENNIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON
1316 T. Street, SE Apartment 3
Washington, DC 20020 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 05/20 2:39 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to44 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON, DARYL THOMAS AGNEW ; USCA Case Number 17-7114 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment | ||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 02/13 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DARYL THOMAS AGNEW. Attorney Lynn E. Cunningham terminated. (Cunningham, Lynn) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 07/27 5:22 PM
USCA Case Number 17-7114 for44 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON, DARYL THOMAS AGNEW. (zrdj) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 07/26 12:41 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re44 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Tue 07/25 10:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to42 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5047443. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Claiborne, William) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
15
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 06/26 4:58 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/26/2017. (lcabj3) |
|
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 06/26 4:57 PM
ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12 and 58, and for the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum opinion, defendant's37 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/26/2017. (lcabj3) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 12/20 10:18 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re37 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Cumming, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 12/07 11:50 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re37 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON. (Claiborne, William) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 12/05 10:34 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to37 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 12/05 2:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiffs'39 consent motion for an extension of time. Plaintiffs shall respond to the37 motion to dismiss by December 7, 2016, and the government shall file its reply, if any, by December 20, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/5/2016. (lcabj3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 12/06 9:04 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motion due by 12/7/2016; Reply, if any, due by 12/20/2016. (tg) |
||
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 10/21 10:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiffs'38 consent motion for an extension of time. Plaintiffs shall oppose the37 motion to dismiss by December 5, 2016. Defendant shall reply by December 16, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/21/2016.(lcabj3) |
||
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time to
Thu 10/20 7:26 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition to DEFENDANTS' motion to dismiss by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/14 12:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA(Cumming, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 09/30 10:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's36 consent motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the35 Third Amended Complaint by October 14, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/30/2016. (lcabj3) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 09/28 1:45 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re35 Amended Complaint by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA(Cumming, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 09/07 12:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA with Jury Demand filed by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON, ALEX DENNIS.(Claiborne, William) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 09/07 2:31 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint by 9/30/2016. (jth) |
||
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Dismiss Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 09/06 5:18 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's32 motion to file a Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs may file a Third Amended Complaint that includes only the allegations that are material to this case. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a), 15(a)(2). Therefore, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f), the allegations regarding Mr. Bey and Mr. Alexander are STRIKEN. Plaintiffs shall have until September 16, 2016 to file a revised Third Amended Complaint that comports with this Order by removing paragraphs 61 through 84, and renumbering the remaining allegations. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint by September 30, 2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of the Third Amended Complaint, defendant's20 motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/6/2016. (lcabj3) |
|
33 | 33
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 09/06 12:36 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re32 MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Amended Complaint filed by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Yong, Esther) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 08/17 10:27 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Amended Complaint by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit proposed Third Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit redlined proposed Third Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/16 10:22 AM
NOTICE of intent to file motion to amend complaint by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON (Claiborne, William) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 08/11 12:16 PM
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2016 re: Defendants'20 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint . The20 Motion was Heard and Taken under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth) |
||
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 08/04 11:36 AM
Set/Reset Hearing: A Motions Hearing in this case is scheduled for Thursday, August 11, 2016, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth) |
||
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Supplemental Memorandum
Mon 07/25 11:36 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re21 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON.(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit informations charging named plaintiffs | ||
29 | 29
respm
Supplemental Memorandum
Mon 07/25 6:09 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to In Response to Minute Order of July 5, 2016 filed by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Yong, Esther) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/25 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Martin Cumming on behalf of GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Cumming, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Tue 07/12 8:11 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Esther Yong on behalf of GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Substituting for attorney Caliandra Burstein (Yong, Esther) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 07/05 5:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs argue that the incommoding statute is vague on its face. But plaintiffs Agnew and Dennis seem to allege that they did not violate the statute at all, and it is not clear to the Court whether they allege that the law is vague as it is applied to them. See, e.g.,19 2d Am. Compl. paras. 89, 100, 158. Defendants maintain that to raise a vagueness challenge under the Fifth Amendment to a statute that does not implicate constitutionally-protected activity, plaintiffs must demonstrate that the statute is vague as applied to them. See Holder v. Humanitarian Law Project, 561 U.S. 1, 20 (2010), quoting Village of Hoffman Estates v. Flipside, Hoffman Estates, Inc., 455 U.S. 489, 495 (1982). So plaintiffs shall file a supplemental pleading addressing the legal question of (1) whether the complaint must, and (2) whether the complaint does - even if plaintiffs maintain that it doesn't have to - state a claim that the incommoding statute is vague as applied to the two of them. (The Court does not have questions about plaintiff Williamson at this time.) In addition, in light of the consent order which substantially narrowed the scope of this litigation, both parties shall address the question of whether Count I as it has been narrowed states a claim under section 1983, which, under Baker v. District of Columbia, 326 F.3d 1302 (D.C. Cir. 2000), requires a plaintiff to allege first, a predicate constitutional violation, and second, a claim that a custom or policy of the municipality caused the violation. Plaintiffs need to specify the particular constitutional violation that forms the basis for the claim in Count 1, and they must point to the specific paragraphs in the complaint that satisfy these elements given the number of paragraphs in the complaint that allege that the particular officer involved had difficulty controlling his temper and may have acted out of racial animus. See, e.g., 2d Am. Compl. paras. 90-92, 151-152. Both parties shall also address whether one can utilize section 1983 to bring a facial challenge to a statute at all, and whether these plaintiffs have standing to challenge the facial validity of the statute when they were arrested but not convicted. One pleading from each side shall be filed by July 25, 2016, and neither pleading shall exceed ten pages. SO ORDERED.Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/5/2016. (lcabj3) |
||
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Fri 12/11 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Caliandra Burstein on behalf of GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Substituting for attorney Chad Copeland (Burstein, Caliandra) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 10/21 5:45 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re20 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Stay re19 Amended Complaint Claims of Rashad Bugg Bey filed by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER. (Copeland, Chad) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/14 10:27 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply in Support of It's Motion to Dismiss is now due by 10/21/2015. (jth) |
||
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 10/08 11:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting24 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to21 plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to ]16] defendant's motion to dismiss. Defendant's reply shall be filed no later than October 21, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/8/2015. (lcabj3) |
||
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 10/07 4:45 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Copeland, Chad) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 10/05 3:21 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that: Plaintiffs' claims in Counts 1 and 3 of19 plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint that relate to the First and Fourth Amendments are hereby dismissed without prejudice; counts 2, 4, and 5 are dismissed without prejudice; all claims against defendant Cathy L. Lanier are dismissed without prejudice; and plaintiff Rashad Bugg Bey is dismissed from this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/5/2015. (lcabj3) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/02 10:53 PM
Consent MOTION to Dismiss by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, RASHAD BUGG BEY, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 10/02 10:45 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay re15 Amended Complaint filed by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON.(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Committee Report, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit ACLU testimony, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Bey SJ Opinion | ||
Tuesday, September 15, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Stay
Tue 09/15 11:27 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , MOTION to Stay re19 Amended Complaint Claims of Rashad Bugg Bey by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER(Copeland, Chad) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Agnew Criminal Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Bugg Bey Superior Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Bugg Bey Superior Court Civil Docket, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Dennis Criminal Docket, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Williamson Criminal Docket, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Council Committee Report | ||
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/01 9:15 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER with Jury Demand filed by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON, ALEX DENNIS, RASHAD BUGG BEY.(jf) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 08/31 5:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs'18 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint and to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the second amended complaint [Dkt. # 18-1] on the docket. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants'16 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay and Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Defendants may move to dismiss the second amended complaint in reliance on their prior motion if they so choose. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/31/2015. (lcabj3) |
||
Sunday, August 30, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Amend/Correct
Sun 08/30 8:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct15 Amended Complaint by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit proposed second amended complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit proposed redlined second amended complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/27 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER re10 Notice of Appearance (Feldon, Gary) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 08/17 2:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of15 the amended complaint, it is ORDERED that12 defendants' initial motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, to stay and dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/17/2015. (lcabj3) |
||
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Stay
Mon 08/10 2:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Stay re15 Amended Complaint by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER(Copeland, Chad) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit DC v Agnew Criminal Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Bugg Bey v DC Civil Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Bugg Bey v DC Civil Docket, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit DC v Dennis Criminal Docket, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit DC v Williamson Criminal Docket, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit DC Council Committee Report | ||
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/25 3:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER with Jury Demand filed by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW, RASHAD BUGG BEY, ALEX DENNIS, RAYNEKA WILLIAMSON.(jf) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Thu 06/25 9:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time Nunc Pro Tunc. The Clerk is directed to file the amended complaint [Dkt. # 14-1] on the docket. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' response to the amended complaint shall be due on or before August 10, 2015; that plaintiffs' opposition to any motion to dismiss shall be due on or before September 8, 2015; and that defendants' reply, if any, shall be due on or before September 29, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/25/2014. (lcabj3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 06/25 10:40 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response to the Amended Complaint is due by 8/10/2015; Plaintiffs' Opposition to any Dispositive Motion is due by 9/8/2015; Defendants' reply, if any, is due by 9/29/2015. (jth) |
||
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 06/24 3:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file amended complaint by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit amended complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 06/09 2:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Consent Motion to Stay Time for Filing Motion for Class Action Treatment13 . In light of the agreement of the parties, it is ORDERED that the time for plaintiff to file a motion for class action treatment is extended until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/9/2015. (lcabj3) |
||
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Mon 06/08 6:37 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay deadline to file class motion by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Fri 05/29 2:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER(Copeland, Chad). Added MOTION to Stay on 5/29/2015 (jf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Docket for Mr. Agnew's Criminal Case, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint in Mr. Bugg Bey's Superior Court Case, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Docket for Mr. Bugg Bey's Superior Court Case, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Council Report for Statute | ||
notice
Notice of QC
Fri 05/29 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re12 Motion to Dismiss; emailed to chad.copeland@dc.gov, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. DONOT REFILE-Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of their motion (jf, ) |
||
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/06 11:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time11 . It is ORDERED that defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before May 29, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/6/2015. (lcabj3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/06 11:19 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response to the Complaint is due by 5/29/2015.(jth) |
||
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/05 11:45 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER (Copeland, Chad) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/05 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Daniel Feldon on behalf of GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CATHY L. LANIER (Feldon, Gary) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Mon 04/06 12:05 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Claiborne, William) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant
Mon 04/06 12:04 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs (Claiborne, William) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General
Mon 04/06 12:02 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 4/1/2015. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 4/22/2015. (Claiborne, William) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
notice
Notice of QC
Thu 04/02 9:21 AM
ent (jf, ) |
||
notice
Notice of QC
Thu 04/02 9:21 AM
ent (jf, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/01 2:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW Chief Cathy Lanier . (Claiborne, William) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/01 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW service on District of Columbia . (Claiborne, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/17 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Bruckheim on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bruckheim, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/16 6:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn E. Cunningham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cunningham, Lynn) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor
Tue 03/10 9:44 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CATHY L. LANIER, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (rdj) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/09 8:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4016235) filed by DARYL THOMAS AGNEW.(Claiborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/10 9:39 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md, ) |