Conticchio v. Life Insurance Company Of North America et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00432 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 06, 2015 4:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bechtel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Life Insurance Company Of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Conticchio
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/03 2:57 PM
ORDER Granting11 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/22 4:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendants Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company Of North America. (Heinz, Von) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 07/08 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Pending Case Settlement by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company Of North America. (Heinz, Von) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 05/26 2:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Life Insurance Company Of North America that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holdings, Inc. for Life Insurance Company Of North America added. . (Heinz, Von) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 05/26 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bechtel Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Heinz, Von) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 05/26 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bechtel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Bechtel Corporation for Bechtel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan added. . (Heinz, Von) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/26 2:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company Of North America. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/5/2015. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/10/2015.(Heinz, Von) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/01 3:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tracy Conticchio. Life Insurance Company Of North America waiver sent on 3/24/2015, answer due 5/23/2015. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 03/19 3:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Tracy Conticchio. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Davis, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/10 12:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, and Life Insurance Company Of North America. (ASB) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag & Gen Order 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Tue 03/10 12:41 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (ASB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/10 12:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3586075), filed by Tracy Conticchio. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/20/2015. Proof of service due by 7/8/2015. (Davis, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons LINA, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Bechtel, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Disability Plan | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 03/10 12:41 PM
Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ASB) |