Dependable Sales and Service, Inc. et al v. Truecar, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | P Kevin Castel |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01742 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 05, 2015 9:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Truecar, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arnold Chevrolet, LCC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beaver Motors Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bellavia Buick, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Biener Auto Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brentlinger Enterprises
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C.S.I. Motors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cascade Auto Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catanese Volkswagen, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cobb Auto Sales, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D.L. New Rochelle Auto Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dependable Sales and Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elk Grove Toyota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fitz Motors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drew Ford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G.S. Autoplex, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Genesee Valley Motors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Genesse Valley Ford LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haldeman Ford of Kutztown, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoffman Ford, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoffman Motors of New London Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoffman of Hartford, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoffman of Simsbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoffman of West Simsbury, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Key Chrysler Jeep & Dodge, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L&S Motors Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
N.R. Automotive, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Miller GT, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Miller, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafferty Subaru, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salerno Duane, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sam Boswell Motors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Soutar's
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tustin Buick GMC, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valley Motors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Westchester Autoplex, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
World Auto Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADA Motors Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Auto Mall Hyundai, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Hyundai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Auto Mall Nissan, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Nissan Superstore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Automall Imports LLC d/b/a Atlantic Chevrolet Cadillac
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BP Auto Group LLC d/b/a Hackettstown Hyundai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beans-Class Ford, Mercury, Inc. d/b/a New Holland Toyota d/b/a New Holland Ford d/b/a New Holland Dodge Chrysler Jeep
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Wright, Inc. d/b/a Bill Wright Toyota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Burien Chevrolet, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Burke Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Naperville Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CDOHY, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Champaign Motors, Inc. d/b/a Champaign Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curran Volkswagen, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DJ Gaudet, LLC d/b/a Autoserv Kia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Lexus of Naperville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Wolfs Chevrolet of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Chevrolet of Naperville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Beyer Motors, Inc. d/b/a Beyer Kia Alexandria (Fairfax Co)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Downs North Bakersfield, Inc. d/b/a North Bakersfield Toyota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eleven, Inc. d/b/a Honda of Decatur
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Empire Holdings PAV, L.L.C. d/b/a Princeton Audi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FBI, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FLAPM, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FOC, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FVWPAB, LLC d/b/a Flemington Audi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fitzgerald Automall, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fitzgerald Motors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Beans Cadillac Oldsmobile, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Cadillac Buick GMC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Chevrolet of Limerick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Beans Ford Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Hyundai of Doylestown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Beans Imports, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Nissan of Limerick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Beans Motors of Limerick, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Kia of Limerick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Beans Motors, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Mitsubishi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Beans of Boyertown, Inc. d/b/a Fred Beans Boyertown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garber CDJR, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garber Chevrolet, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garber Delray Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garber Doral, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garcia Imports, Inc. d/b/a Garcia Honda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garcia Infiniti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garrands Nissan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Kia (Fairfax Co)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gum Springs, L.L.C. d/b/a Beyer Subaru
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Healey Chevrolet, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC d/b/a Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep & Ram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Healey Ford Lincoln, LLC d/b/a Healey Ford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Healey KIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Healey Mitsubishi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hempstead Auto Co., Inc. d/b/a Jaguar of Great Neck/Roslyn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hempstead Auto Sales LLC d/b/a Millennium Honda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heritage Jaguar of Freeport, Inc. d/b/a Heritage Jaguar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hutchins Motors Inc. d/b/a OConnor Auto Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JJM Atlantic Automotive LLC d/b/a Atlantic CJDR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JS Autoworld, LLC d/b/a Atlantic Toyota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JS Huntington Motors LLC d/b/a Chevrolet of Huntington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Damson Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda d/b/a Jerry Damson Acura
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Damson Nissan, L.L.C. d/b/a Jerry Damson Nissan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Curley Pontiac-GMC Truck, Inc. d/b/a Jim Curley Kia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph H. Nolette, LLC d/b/a Plaza Cadillac
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K.C. Imports, Inc. d/b/a Curttright Honda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kraft Motorcar Company of Tallahassee, Inc. d/b/a Kraft Nissan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LFO, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larson Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Tacoma d/b/a Mercedes Benz of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Cadillac d/b/a Larson Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram d/b/a Volkswagen of Tacoma d/b/a Larson Hyundai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Buick/GMC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Massapequa Imports LLC d/b/a Lexus of Rockville Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Ford of Mechanicsburg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McCafferty Motors of Mechanicsburg, Inc. d/b/a McCafferty Kia of Mechanicsburg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Millennium Super Store LLC d/b/a Millennium Toyota
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miller Motor Car Corporation d/b/a Miller Honda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murphy Cadillac, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Bay Cadillac Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Buick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Chevrolet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Painter Sun Country Chrysler Inc. d/b/a Painter Sun Country Mitsubishi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Platinum Volkswagen, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Plaza-Lincoln Mercury, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lincoln
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renton C, Inc. d/b/a Pros Fiat
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rowe Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Precision Toyota of Tucson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Mitsubishi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schumacher Auto Group, Inc. d/b/a Schumacher Subaru
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schumacher Volkswagen, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sowell Automotive, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai of La Quinta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sunrise Automall LLC d/b/a Atlantic Honda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sunrise Chevrolet, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Syosset Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Advantage Hyundai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Chrysler Dodge, Inc. d/b/a Taylor Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Robert Larson Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Tacoma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Twenty-Two, Inc. d/b/a Jerry Damson Honda Florence
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Village Euro Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Norwell d/b/a Porsche Norwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Village Imports, Inc. d/b/a Nissan Village
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Village Motors Group, Inc. d/b/a Honda Village
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Village Motors North, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Village d/b/a Volvo Village of Danvers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Village Motors South, Inc. d/b/a Volvo Village of Hingham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Village Motors, Inc. d/b/a Boston Volvo Village
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
W.S. Healey Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet Buick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilson Imports, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Naperville
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Bay Ridge Foreign Auto Sales Corp
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bay Ridge Luxury Automobile Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bay Ridge Motor Sales, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bay Ridge Nissan, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fordham Auto Sales, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Freehold Automotive Limited, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Freehold Chrysler Jeep, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hackettstown Auto Sales, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hillside Automotive, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoffman of East Hartford, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoover Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hudson Auto Sales, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Infinity of Manhattan, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manhattan Foreign Autos Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manhattan Luxury Automobiles, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nissan of Manhattan, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Route 22 Auto Sales, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Route 22 Automobiles, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Route 22 Nissan, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sendell Motors, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Skyline Automobiles Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TTV Motors, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tenafly Kia
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Westchester Foreign Autos,Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Simon Chevrolet Buick, LTD
Terminated: 05/26/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
133 | 133
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 07/15 8:31 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:132 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Truecar, Inc. against ADA Motors Inc., Arnold Chevrolet, LCC, Auto Mall Hyundai, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Hyundai, Auto Mall Nissan, Inc. d/b/a Atlantic Nissan Superstore, Automall Imports LLC d/b/a Atlantic Chevrolet Cadillac, BP Auto Group LLC d/b/a Hackettstown Hyundai, Beaver Motors Inc., Bellavia Buick, Inc., Biener Auto Group, Inc., Bill Wright, Inc. d/b/a Bill Wright Toyota, Brentlinger Enterprises, Burien Chevrolet, Inc, CDOHY, Inc, Cascade Auto Group, Catanese Volkswagen, Inc., Champaign Motors, Inc. d/b/a Champaign Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Cobb Auto Sales, Inc., DJ Gaudet, LLC d/b/a Autoserv Kia, Dan Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Lexus of Naperville, Dan Wolfs Chevrolet of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Chevrolet of Naperville, Dependable Sales and Service, Inc., Downs North Bakersfield, Inc. d/b/a North Bakersfield Toyota, Elk Grove Toyota, FBI, Inc, FLAPM, Inc, FOC, Inc, Fitzgerald Auto Mall Lexington Park Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Fitzgerald Automall, Inc, Fitzgerald Lakeforest Motors, Inc, Fitzgerald Motors, Inc., Garber Buick-GMC Truck Inc, Garber CDJR, Inc, Garber Chevrolet, Inc, Garber Doral, Inc, Garber Ft. Pierce, Inc, Garcia Imports, Inc. d/b/a Garcia Honda, Garcia Infiniti, Genesee Valley Motors, Inc., Genesse Valley Ford LLC, Healey Chevrolet, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet, Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep, LLC d/b/a Healey Chrysler Dodge Jeep & Ram, Healey Ford Lincoln, LLC d/b/a Healey Ford, Healey KIA, Healey Mitsubishi, Hempstead Auto Co., Inc. d/b/a Jaguar of Great Neck/Roslyn, Hempstead Auto Sales LLC d/b/a Millennium Honda, Heritage Jaguar of Freeport, Inc. d/b/a Heritage Jaguar, Hoffman Ford, Inc., Hoffman Motors of New London Inc., Hoffman of Hartford, Inc., Hoffman of Simsbury, JJM Atlantic Automotive LLC d/b/a Atlantic CJDR, JS Huntington Motors LLC d/b/a Chevrolet of Huntington, Jim Soutar Dodge City, Incorporated, Joseph H. Nolette, LLC d/b/a Plaza Cadillac, K.C. Imports, Inc. d/b/a Curttright Honda, Kraft Motorcar Company of Tallahassee, Inc. d/b/a Kraft Nissan, LFO, Inc, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Buick/GMC, Lochmandy Motors, LLC d/b/a Lochmandy Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, Massapequa Imports LLC d/b/a Lexus of Rockville Center, Miller Motor Car Corporation d/b/a Miller Honda, Murphy Cadillac, Inc., North Bay Cadillac Co., Inc., Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Buick, Painter Motor Company d/b/a Painter Chevrolet, Painter Sun Country Chrysler Inc. d/b/a Painter Sun Country Mitsubishi, Park Ford Of Mahopac Inc., Paul Miller Performance, L.L.C., Paul Miller Sportscar,Inc., Paul Miller, Inc., Plaza-Lincoln Mercury, LLC d/b/a Plaza Lincoln, Rafferty Subaru, Inc., Sam Boswell Motors, Inc., Soutar's, Sunrise Automall LLC d/b/a Atlantic Honda, Syosset Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Advantage Hyundai, Taylor Chrysler Dodge, Inc. d/b/a Taylor Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Tustin Buick GMC, Inc., Valley Motors, Inc., Village Euro Motors, Inc. d/b/a Audi of Norwell d/b/a Porsche Norwell, Village Imports, Inc. d/b/a Nissan Village, Village Motors Group, Inc. d/b/a Honda Village, Village Motors North, Inc. d/b/a Hyundai Village d/b/a Volvo Village of Danvers, Village Motors South, Inc. d/b/a Volvo Village of Hingham, Village Motors, Inc. d/b/a Boston Volvo Village, W.S. Healey Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. d/b/a Healey Chevrolet Buick, Westbury Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc., Wolf Motors of Naperville, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Naperville. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated July 12, 2019, TrueCar's motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs' remaining state-law claims. Final Judgment is entered in favor of TrueCar as to Count One of the Amended Complaint and the remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/15/2019)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Mon 07/15 8:32 AM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
132 | 132
10
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 07/12 4:40 PM
OPINION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO RECONSIDER re:126 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) : TrueCars motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs remaining state-law claims. The Clerk is directed to enter Final Judgment in favor of TrueCar as to Count One of the Amended Complaint and dismiss the remaining claims without prejudice. The Clerk is further directed to close the case and terminate the motion. (Docket # 126.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/12/2019) (jwh) |