Jonathan Retta et al v. Millennium Products, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01801 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 07, 2015 7:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Millennium Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Manire
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Retta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kirsten Schofield
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
153 | 153
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 01/29 5:02 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,143 filed by Justin Ference. CCA # 17-56375 Appellant's motion (Docket Entry No. 10) for voluntary dismissal is granted. This appeal is dismissed with prejudice. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (bm) |