Bennett et al v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01923 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 12, 2015 7:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Davis Bennett
32589-112 P O Box 675733
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
124 | 124
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 08/06 8:58 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Post-Remand Order Dismissing FTCA Action Without Prejudice by Judge R. Gary Klausner: On August 2, 2018, the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issued a Mandate vacating the Court's order dismissing with prejudice FTCA action for failure to prosecute. Pursuant to the Mandate, the Court hereby dismisses Plaintiff's FTCA action without prejudice. (bp) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
123 | 123
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 08/03 2:04 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,99 , CCA # 16-55694 The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered December 05, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA MEMORANDUM119 , The judgment of this Court, entered December 05, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. ] (mat) |