Wilson v. Lee County Detention Center et al(INMATE 3)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William Keith Watkins |
Referred: | Wallace Capel, Jr |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00167 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2015 |
Defendant
Jay Jones
|
|
Defendant
Lee County Detention Center
|
|
Defendant
Luther Strange
|
|
Interested Party
Staff Attorneys
|
|
Plaintiff
Tewan Wilson
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Wed 07/15 3:27 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that Mr. Tewan Wilsons petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/15/2015.(dmn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/15 3:21 PM
ORDER that the18 Recommendation is ADOPTED, that Petitioner Tewan Wilson's1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is DISMISSED without prejudice to afford Mr. Wilson an opportunity to exhaust all state-court remedies available to him. A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/15/2015. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 07/14 4:50 PM
NO OBJECTION filed to18 Recommendation. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) |
||
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 06/29 4:07 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable.17 Order sent to Tewan Wilson was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Not Undeliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward," (No pdf attached to this entry) (kh, ) |
||
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 06/25 2:42 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tewan Wilson be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to afford Wilson an opportunity to exhaust all state court remedies available to him. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 6/25/2015. (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/05 11:52 AM
ORDERED that on or before June 22, 2015, Wilson shall show cause why his1 petition should not be dismissed without prejudice for his failure to exhaust state remedies. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/5/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/03 12:02 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jay Jones, Lee County Detention Center, Luther Strange. (Starrett, Marc) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Wed 06/03 12:00 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jay Jones, Lee County Detention Center, Luther Strange.(Starrett, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Case action summary sheet, State v. Tewan Wilson, Lee Circuit Court CC-13-592, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Appellants Brief, Wilson v. State, Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals CR 13-0838 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Appellees Brief, Wilson v. State, Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals CR 13-0838 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Order, Wilson v. State, Alabama Court of Criminal Appeals CR 13-0838 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Memorandum Opinion, Wilson v. State, CR 13-0838 (Ala. Crim. App. Sept. 26, 2014) (mem. op.), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Judgment, Wilson v. State, CR 13-0838 (Ala. Crim. App. Oct. 15, 2014) | ||
Tuesday, May 19, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
service
Return Receipt Card
Tue 05/19 2:45 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Complaint and13 order signed by Iris Bridges for Jay Jones served on 5/15/2015, answer due 6/5/2015; signed by J. Taylor for Luther Strange served on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Answer Habeas
Wed 05/13 12:17 PM
ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before June 3, 2015, Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Sheriff Jay Jones & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/13/2015. (kh, ) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 05/13 11:09 AM
Partial Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 4602036776. (kh, ) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 05/11 2:13 PM
MOTION to Amend #1 by Tewan Wilson. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/06 4:12 PM
NOTICE by Tewan Wilson (kh, ) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/04 2:03 PM
NOTICE by Tewan Wilson (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 04/29 9:53 AM
ORDERED that the petitioner be GRANTED an extension from May 15, 2015, to and including May 22, 2015, to forward to the Clerk of the Court the $5.00 filing fee for this action, in compliance with this courts orders (see Doc. No.6 .) To assist in compliance with the courts orders, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send copies of this order and Court Doc. No.6 to the account clerk at the Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/29/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Response to Order
Mon 04/27 3:22 PM
Response to6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment by Tewan Wilson. (djy, ) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 04/20 9:15 AM
ORDERED that: 1. On or before May 15, 2015, Petitioner shall forward to the Clerk of the Court the $5.00 filing fee; and 2. Except to the extent that payment is required under this order, Petitioners3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/20/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 04/17 4:12 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tewan Wilson. (kh, ) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 03/26 10:16 AM
ORDERED that on or before April 15, 2015, Petitioner shall file a jail account statement from the account clerk at Lee County Detention Center containing the account clerk's certified statement of the balance in Petitioner's jail account at the time he filed his petition (March 5, 2015), or Petitioner shall submit the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/26/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 25, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit
Wed 03/25 3:33 PM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Tewan Wilson. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/18 8:57 AM
ORDERED that on or before 4/7/2015, Petitioner shall either submit the $5.00 filing fee or file the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order; copy of IFP form mailed as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/18/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/17 2:01 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tewan Wilson.(NO IFP. NO FILING FEE.)(ajw, Amanda) |