John Muir Health, a California non-profit public benefit corporation v. SciQuest, Inc.,a Delaware corporation et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-01294 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 15, 2015 6:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
3761258 Canada Inc., a Canadian corporation f/k/a UPSIDE SOFTWARE INC.
|
|
Defendant
SciQuest, Inc.,a Delaware corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3761258 Canada Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SciQuest, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Muir Health, a California non-profit public benefit corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
John Muir Health
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/28 11:11 AM
ORDER granting 40 STIPULATION For Dismissal with Prejudice filed by John Muir Health. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/28/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 04/27 3:40 PM
STIPULATION For Dismissal with Prejudice filed by John Muir Health. (Ficenec, James) (Filed on 4/27/2016) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Change In Counsel
Wed 04/06 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Matthew Dennis Barnette (Barnette, Matthew) (Filed on 4/6/2016) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 03/21 2:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that by the request of the parties, the case management conference currently scheduled for March 24, 2016 is continued to May 5, 2016 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management conference statement or a stipulation of dismissal shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016) Modified on 3/21/2016 (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Mon 03/21 12:00 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John Muir Health. (Ficenec, James) (Filed on 3/21/2016) |
|
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
order
Pretrial Order
Thu 12/10 9:10 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/10/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 12/10 9:13 AM
Set/Reset Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2017 to 3/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015) |
||
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 12/09 3:43 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING ADR AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES filed by John Muir Health. (Ficenec, James) (Filed on 12/9/2015) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 12/04 4:28 PM
STIPULATION TO ONE WEEK EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF ADR REPORT AND STIPULATED PRETRIAL SCHEDULE filed by John Muir Health. (Ficenec, James) (Filed on 12/4/2015) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/13 9:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/12/2015. The parties shall confer re: form of ADR and case deadlines and submit a stipulation by 12/4/2015. ADR shall be completed by 2/2016. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Court to issue Pretrial Order. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorney: James Ficenec. Defendant Attorneys: Catherine Lee (Upside Software, Inc.); Larry Kunin via Court Call (SciQuest Inc.) This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2015) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 11/05 4:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by John Muir Health (Ficenec, James) (Filed on 11/5/2015) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 11/05 4:09 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by John Muir Health. (Ficenec, James) (Filed on 11/5/2015) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 11/05 11:34 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by 3761258 Canada Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Mawji Family Trust for 3761258 Canada Inc.. Defendant 3761258 Canada Inc. F/K/A Upside Software Inc.'s Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 11/5/2015) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Wed 11/04 8:48 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 28 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Appear by Telephone
Tue 11/03 7:16 AM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by SciQuest, Inc.. (Kunin, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/3/2015) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
respoth
Answer to CounterClaim
Mon 10/26 10:43 AM
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM OF SCIQUEST, INC. byJohn Muir Health. (Ficenec, James) (Filed on 10/26/2015) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
18
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 09/30 8:32 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer of Defendant 3761258 Canada Inc. F/K/A Upside Software Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Damages of John Muir Health For (1) Rescission; (2) Breach of Contract; (3) Negligence; (4) Fraud, Intentional Misrepresentation; (5) Fraud, Concealment; (6) Unfair Competition; (7) Revocation of Acceptance by3761258 Canada Inc.. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/30/2015) |
|
25 | 25
11
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 09/30 1:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Defendant SciQuest, Inc.s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, And Counterclaim To Plaintiffs Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against John Muir Health bySciQuest, Inc.. (Greer, Julia) (Filed on 9/30/2015) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
15
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/31 10:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byJohn Muir Health.(Ficenec, James) (Filed on 8/31/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 08/26 11:12 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 22 Stipulation to Continue October 15, 2015 Case Management Conference and Sixth Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/26 11:13 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 11/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015) |
||
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 08/25 12:36 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 16-2(d) to Continue October 15, 2015 Case Management Conference and Sixth Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 3761258 Canada Inc..(Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 8/25/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 07/31 2:54 PM
Set/Reset Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015) |
||
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 07/23 9:50 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 20 Stipulation to Continue September 10, 2015 Case Management Conference and Fifth Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time For All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/23 9:55 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 10/15/2015 01:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015) |
||
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 07/22 10:02 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 16-2(d) to Continue September 10, 2015 Case Management Conference and Fifth Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time For All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 3761258 Canada Inc..(Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 7/22/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/12 8:25 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lawrence H. Kunin (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015) Modified on 6/12/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/12 7:15 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9594626.) filed by SciQuest, Inc..(Kunin, Lawrence) (Filed on 6/12/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Georgia Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Florida Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 06/02 2:36 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 16 Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 16-2(d) to Continue June 25, 2015 Case Management Conference And Fourth Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time For All Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 06/02 9:22 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 16-2(d) to Continue June 25, 2015 Case Management Conference And Fourth Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time For All Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 3761258 Canada Inc..(Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 6/2/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 06/02 2:36 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015) |
||
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 06/01 7:30 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 14 Stipulated Protective Order For Standard Litigation (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 05/29 9:21 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order For Standard Litigation filed by 3761258 Canada Inc.. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 5/29/2015) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 05/26 1:11 PM
STIPULATION Third Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time For All Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 3761258 Canada Inc.. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 5/26/2015) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 04/23 2:10 PM
STIPULATION Second Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time For All Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 3761258 Canada Inc.. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 4/23/2015) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/14 2:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Muir Health.. (Ficenec, James) (Filed on 4/14/2015) |
|
Friday, April 10, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 04/10 8:53 AM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/09 10:18 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 3761258 Canada Inc... (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 4/9/2015) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/09 9:41 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SciQuest, Inc... (Greer, Julia) (Filed on 4/9/2015) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 03/26 12:54 PM
STIPULATION Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) Extending Time For All Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 3761258 Canada Inc.. (Lee, Catherine) (Filed on 3/26/2015) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 03/20 1:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SciQuest, Inc. Proof of Serve (Documents Pertain To After A Judge Is Assigned) (Greer, Julia) (Filed on 3/20/2015) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 03/20 1:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SciQuest, Inc. Proof of Service (Defendant SciQuest's Notice of Removal, Etc.) (Greer, Julia) (Filed on 3/20/2015) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 03/20 9:55 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 03/19 3:01 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 03/19 2:48 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by SciQuest, Inc.,a Delaware corporation identifying Other Affiliate FMR LLC, Other Affiliate Wasatch Advisors, Inc. for SciQuest, Inc.,a Delaware corporation. (Greer, Julia) (Filed on 3/19/2015) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/19 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C15-00275. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-9374907). Filed bySciQuest, Inc.,a Delaware corporation.(Greer, Julia) (Filed on 3/19/2015) |
|
Att: 1 62 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 17 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |