Frank Palmer v. Omni Hotels Managment Corporation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02126 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 6:27 PM PDT |
Defendant
Omni Hotels Managment Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Frank Palmer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Mon 07/13 9:27 AM
RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Central: case has been opened in Southern District of California as case 3:15-cv-01527. (rn) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
order
Change Venue
Thu 07/09 11:08 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE19 . The Court HEREBY TRANSFERS this matter to the Southern District of California for all further proceedings. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 7/9/2015 (lc) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 07/01 2:11 PM
REPLY MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California19 filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. (Chiang, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Wed 06/24 4:17 PM
OPPOSITION Opposition re: MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California19 filed by Plaintiff Frank Palmer.(Salisbury, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
29 | 29
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 06/24 4:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero re: ORDER CLARIFYING SCHEDULING REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE. On May 13, 2015, Defendant Omni Hotels Management Corporation ("Defendant") filed a Motion to Transfer Venue from this Court to the Southern District of California ("Motion"). The Motion was originally scheduled for a June 15, 2015 hearing on its cover page (ECF No. 19), but appeared as being set for hearing on July 15, 2015 on the Court's electronic Docket. (See ECF Nos. 19, 23.) On May 14, 2015, and June 23, 2015, Defendant and Plaintiff Frank Palmer ("Plaintiff") filed two stipulations to continue the Motion hearing from June 15, 2015, to July 13, 2015. (ECF Nos. 21, 28.) For good cause shown, the stipulations are GRANTED. However, as indicated in the Notice issued May 18, 2015, the Court has vacated the hearing on the Motion and the parties are not required to appear on July 13, 2015. The briefing schedule for the Motion remains as set by the Local Rules and this Court's Initial Standing Order. (jre) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Errata
Tue 06/23 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. correcting MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California19 , Declaration (Motion related)20 , Stipulation to Continue,21 (Chiang, Kevin) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 06/08 2:28 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. On the Court's own motion the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on 6/22/15 is continued to Monday, 7/27/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/05 12:11 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition22 filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation.(Farber, Mia) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
order
Protective Order
Mon 06/08 8:54 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re Stipulation for Protective Order,24 . See document for details. (yb) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Protective Order
Fri 05/29 10:18 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation.(Farber, Mia) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Regarding the Parties Stipulated Protective Order Precluding Disclosure of Confidential and/or Proprietary Information | ||
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Change Venue
Mon 05/18 3:56 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING HEARINGON MOTION and CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Management Corporation19 ,set for hearing on July 15, 2015. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. Additionally, the Court continues the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on Tuesday, May 26, 2015 to Monday, June 22, 2015 8:30 a.m. (lc) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 05/15 4:04 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery) JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Frank Palmer (Salisbury, Lawrence) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Continue
Thu 05/14 6:34 PM
First STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Omni's Motion to Transfer Venue from June 15, 2015 to July 13, 2015 Re: MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California19 filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation.(Chiang, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation | ||
20 | 20
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Thu 05/14 1:15 PM
DECLARATION of Kevin Chiang regarding compliance with Local Rule 7-3 in support of MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California19 filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. (Chiang, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Change Venue
Wed 05/13 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero.(Farber, Mia) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points in Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Maureen Anderson in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Chiang in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue | ||
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 05/11 12:25 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Updated) ; estimated length of trial To Be Determined, filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation..(Farber, Mia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Pretrial Dates | ||
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 04/27 12:34 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 5, 2015 filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation.(Farber, Mia) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Further Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline | ||
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/15 1:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE COURTS APRIL 27, 2015 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AS WELL AS THE DEADLINE TO FILE A JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT BY 30 DAYS14 by Judge S. James Otero: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/11/2015; Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2015 at 08:30 AM. (lc) Modified on 4/15/2015 (lc) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 04/13 3:10 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's March 27, 2015 Scheduling Order ; estimated length of trial Defendant, filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation..(DeLaney, Damien) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Pretrial Dates | ||
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Continue
Tue 04/07 3:56 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 04/27/2015 to 05/27/2015 or Soon Thereafter filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation.(DeLaney, Damien) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Continue Scheduling Conference | ||
Friday, March 27, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 03/27 11:02 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) |
|
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/27 10:57 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 03/26 11:57 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation.(Farber, Mia) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Errata
Thu 03/26 11:22 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. correcting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),9 Previous Filing Was Made in Error (Farber, Mia) |
|
Wednesday, March 25, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 03/25 1:01 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Omni Hotels Managment Corporation answer now due 4/29/2015; Frank Palmer answer now due 4/29/2015, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation.(Farber, Mia) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/24 4:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/24 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (car) |
|
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/24 4:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Omni Hotels Managment Corporation, (Chiang, Kevin) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/23 12:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation (Farber, Mia) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 03/23 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. (Farber, Mia) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/23 11:58 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation, (Farber, Mia) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/23 11:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. (Farber, Mia) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/23 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC572892 Receipt No: 0973-15417157 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. (Attorney Mia D Farber added to party Omni Hotels Managment Corporation(pty:dft))(Farber, Mia) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mia Farber, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Rosalyn Smith | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/24 4:25 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Omni Hotels Managment Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed in State Court on 2/19/15 by plaintiff Frank Palmer. Submitted with attachment 1 to Notice of Removal. (car) |