Paul Thomas Kappel and Kathryn Roberta Kappel
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Paul M Glenn |
Case #: | 3:11-bk-05735 |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2011 |
Discharged: | Jul 08, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2013 |
Debtor
Paul Thomas Kappel, Sr.
13 Front St
Palm Coast, FL 32137-1453 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Kathryn Roberta Kappel
13 Front Street
Palm Coast, FL 32137 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - JAX 11
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/25/2013 10:46 PM EST |
Tuesday, August 02, 2011 | ||
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:11-bk-05735) [misc,volp11a2] (1039.00). Receipt Number 25576259, Amount Paid $1039.00 (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.) Schedules A-J and Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs. Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Paul Thomas Kappel Sr., Kathryn Roberta Kappel. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/30/2011 Disclosure Statement due by 11/30/2011 (Wilcox, Robert) Modified on 8/3/2011 (Mullikin, Cathy). See Corrective Entry dated 8/3/11 | |
2 | 2 Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Joint Debtor Kathryn Roberta Kappel, Debtor Paul Thomas Kappel Sr.. (Wilcox, Robert) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: June 16, 2011. Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Debtor Paul Thomas Kappel Sr.. (Wilcox, Robert) | |
4 | 4 Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: June 16, 2011. Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Joint Debtor Kathryn Roberta Kappel. (Wilcox, Robert) | |
5 | 5 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Voluntary Petition, Verification of Creditor Matrix, Declaration Regarding Schedules A-J, and Summary of Schedules, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Statement of Social Security Number Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Joint Debtor Kathryn Roberta Kappel, Debtor Paul Thomas Kappel Sr. . (Wilcox, Robert) | |
6 | 6 Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Robert D Wilcox on behalf of Joint Debtor Kathryn Roberta Kappel, Debtor Paul Thomas Kappel Sr.. (Wilcox, Robert) | |
10 | 10 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Robert D Wilcox, Kathryn Roberta Kappel on behalf of Joint Debtor Kathryn Roberta Kappel, Debtor Paul Thomas Kappel Sr.. (Craft, Tonya) |