City of Vallejo, California
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 9 | |
Judge: | Michael S Mcmanus |
Case #: | 2:08-bk-26813 |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2008 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 04, 2011 |
Debtor
City of Vallejo, California
555 Santa Clara St
Vallejo, CA 94590-5922 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Official Unsecured Creditors Committee of City of Vallejo Retirees
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
1. | REFILE-Two years after bankruptcy, California city again mired in pension debt (reuters.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/02/2013 | |
Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago |
Friday, August 27, 2021 | ||
virtual
Change of Address by Attorney
Fri 08/27 9:50 AM
|