The Estate of Antonia Cerda et al v. Olympus America Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Beverly Reid O'Connell |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02318 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2015 7:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Eric Arabit
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Vincent J Hernandez
207 E Mooney Dr
Monterey Park, CA 91755 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katrina Respicio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Olympus America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Olympus Corporation of the Americas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Olympus Medical System Corp
|
|
Plaintiff
Ramona Vargas Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Estate of Antonia Cerda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanna Cerda
|
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Cerda
|
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Cerda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armando Cerda
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Receipt
Wed 06/10 1:24 PM
Receipt of copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse, Case No. BC573665, acknowledging receipt on 6/3/2015 by A. Hendrickson, Deputy Clerk. (cw) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Mon 06/01 9:23 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Central Division. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Central Division. (jp) |
|
44 | 44
order
Remand Case to State Court
Mon 06/01 9:22 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion to Remand35 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Court finds that Defendants have failed to carry their burden of demonstrating that removal was proper. Plaintiffs' motions to remand are therefore GRANTED. The six cases subject to this Order are hereby transferred to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Objection
Fri 05/29 5:41 PM
OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other)42 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Katrina Respicio. (Young, Christopher) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/29 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Armando Cerda, Cynthia Cerda. (Kaufman, Peter) |
|
41 | 41
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 05/29 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. ORDER VACATING HEARING. The Court has pending, MOTION TO REMAND. The Court concludes that the matter is appropriate for resolution without the argument of counsel. Accordingly, the hearing previously scheduled for Monday, June 1, 2015 at 1:30 p.m., is hereby VACATED. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. IT IS SO ORDERED THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/18 4:54 PM
REPLY Opposition MOTION to Remand Case to Central District35 filed by Plaintiffs Armando Cerda, Cynthia Cerda, Ramona Vargas Martinez.(Kaufman, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Peter L. Kaufman, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - 1 of 13, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 2 of 13, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - 3 of 13, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - 4 of 13, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - 5 of 13, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - 6 of 13, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - 7 of 13, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - 8 of 13, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I - 9 of 13, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J - 10 of 13, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K - 12 of 13, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L - 12 of 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M -13 of 13 | ||
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Mon 05/11 7:25 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher M. Young In Opposition To MOTION to Remand Case to Central District35 filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Katrina Respicio.(Young, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/11 7:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Remand Case to Central District35 filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Katrina Respicio. (Young, Christopher) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 05/04 2:51 PM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Court conducts Status Conference. The Court informs counsel that the Motion to Remand will remain on calendar for June 1, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will issue a further order as to the briefing on the Motions to Dismiss or permitting the plaintiff to file a Consolidated Complaint after the ruling on the Motion to Remand. IT IS SO ORDERED.Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (rfi) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/29 4:03 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court, on its own motion, ADVANCES the Status Conference in this matter to 5/4/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Wed 04/22 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District filed by Plaintiff Armando Cerda, Cynthia Cerda. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell.(Kaufman, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Peter L. Kaufman in Accordance with Local Rule 7-3, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand of Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/08 9:56 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference in this matter for May 4, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. The Court stays the briefing and the hearing on the pending motions until after the Status Conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) |
|
33 | 33
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 04/08 9:54 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at BRO_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (rfi) |
|
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Tue 04/07 5:33 PM
DECLARATION of Jameson B. Carroll In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendants Vincent J. Hernandez, Eric Arabit, and Katrina Respicio 30 filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Katrina Respicio. (Young, Christopher) |
|
31 | 31
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 04/07 5:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendants Vincent J. Hernandez, Eric Arabit, and Katrina Respicio 30 filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Katrina Respicio. (Young, Christopher) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Tue 04/07 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendants Vincent J. Hernandez, Eric Arabit, and Katrina Respicio filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Katrina Respicio. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell.(Young, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Tue 04/07 5:20 PM
DECLARATION of Pierre Lacroix In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas 26 filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Young, Christopher) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Tue 04/07 5:19 PM
DECLARATION of Jameson B. Carroll In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas 26 filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Young, Christopher) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 04/07 5:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas 26 filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Young, Christopher) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Tue 04/07 5:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell.(Young, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
order
Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Tue 04/07 10:43 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV15-02103 BRO (JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV15-02318 BRO (JCx). Signed by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (mg) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/06 9:52 AM
Text Entry by Judge John F. Walter striking docket entries17 ,20 . Motion date violates the Court's Standing Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Fri 04/03 2:46 PM
DECLARATION of Pierre Lacroix In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendant Olympus Corporation Of The Americas 20 filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Young, Christopher) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Fri 04/03 2:45 PM
DECLARATION of Jameson B. Carroll In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendant Olympus Corporation Of The Americas 20 filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Young, Christopher) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 04/03 2:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendant Olympus Corporation Of The Americas 20 filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Young, Christopher) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Fri 04/03 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendant Olympus Corporation Of The Americas filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter.(Young, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Fri 04/03 2:31 PM
DECLARATION of Jameson B. Carroll In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendants Vincent J. Hernandez, Eric Arabit and Katrina Respicio 17 filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Katrina Respicio. (Young, Christopher) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 04/03 2:30 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendants Vincent J. Hernandez, Eric Arabit and Katrina Respicio 17 filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Katrina Respicio. (Young, Christopher) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Fri 04/03 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Defendants Vincent J. Hernandez, Eric Arabit and Katrina Respicio filed by Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Katrina Respicio. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter.(Young, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 04/03 12:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Olympus America Inc.(Young, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Wed 04/01 1:46 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/30 4:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Certificate of Service served on 03/30/2015. (Young, Christopher) |
|
13 | 13
attorney
Filing Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 03/30 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Michael Weiss for Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Katrina Respicio. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (esa) |
|
12 | 12
attorney
Filing Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 03/30 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Jameson B. Carroll for Defendants Eric Arabit, Vincent J Hernandez, Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Katrina Respicio. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (esa) |
|
11 | 11
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/30 12:32 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/30 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/27 7:04 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Katrina Respicio, (Attorney Christopher M Young added to party Katrina Respicio(pty:dft))(Young, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/27 7:01 PM
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Young, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Related Case(s)
Fri 03/27 7:00 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-2103 (Young, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/27 6:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Vincent J Hernandez, (Attorney Christopher M Young added to party Vincent J Hernandez(pty:dft))(Young, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/27 6:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Eric Arabit, (Attorney Christopher M Young added to party Eric Arabit(pty:dft))(Young, Christopher) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/27 6:54 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Olympus America Inc, (Young, Christopher) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/27 6:53 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Olympus Corporation of the Americas, (Young, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/27 6:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Young, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/27 6:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC573665 Receipt No: 0973-15453836 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas. (Attorney Christopher M Young added to party Olympus America Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher M Young added to party Olympus Corporation of the Americas(pty:dft))(Young, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/30 12:29 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT, Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County Case BC573665 against defendants Eric Arabit, Does 1 through 20 inclusive, Vincent J Hernandez, Olympus America Inc, Olympus Corporation of the Americas, Olympus Medical System Corp, Katrina Respicio, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Ramona Vargas Martinez, Armando Cerda, The Estate of Antonia Cerda, Cynthia Cerda. (esa) |