New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Referred: Frank Maas
Case #: 1:11-cv-09186
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause18:981 Civil Forfeiture
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2011
Terminated:Oct 21, 2013
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2016 10:48 AM EST
Claimant
Lebanese Canadian Bank SAL
Represented By
Evan T. Barr
Steptoe & Johnson, Llp (nyc)
contact info
John Michael Hillebrecht
Dla Piper Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Patrick J. Smith
Dla Piper Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Kevin Walsh
Dewey & Leboeuf, L.L.P.(nyc)
contact info
Elisabeth L. Page
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Joshua David Arisohn
Dewey & Leboeuf, L.L.P.(nyc)
contact info
Claimant
Manheim Automotive Financial Services, Inc.
6205 Peachtree Dunwoody Rd.
Atlanta, GA 30328
Represented By
Jessica Christine Moller
Bond, Schoeneck & King, Pllc (gdncity)
contact info
Claimant
Munich RE America
555 College Road East
Princeton, NJ 08543
Represented By
Edward Hayum
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
J. Scott Tarbutton
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Richard C. Bennett
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Sean P. Carter
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Cozen
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Miller
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Claimant
Munich RE Group
555 College Road East
Princeton, NJ 08543
Represented By
Edward Hayum
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
J. Scott Tarbutton
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Richard C. Bennett
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Sean P. Carter
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Cozen
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Miller
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Claimant
One Beacon America Insurance Company
One Beacon Lane
Canton, MA 02021
Represented By
Edward Hayum
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
J. Scott Tarbutton
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Richard C. Bennett
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Sean P. Carter
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Cozen
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Miller
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Claimant
One Beacon Insurance Group
One Beacon Lane
Canton, MA 02021
Represented By
Edward Hayum
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
J. Scott Tarbutton
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Richard C. Bennett
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Sean P. Carter
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Cozen
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Miller
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Claimant
Deborah D Peterson
Represented By
Liviu Vogel
Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman Broudyllp
contact info
Claimant
Societe General Bank au Liban
Represented By
Michael J Sullivan
Ashcroft Law Firm, Llc/ashcroft Sullivan
contact info
Luis A. Reyes
Ashcroft Law Firm, Llc/ashcroft Sutton Ratcliffe
contact info
Claimant
Automotive Finance Corp.
Represented By
Gabriel Adam Berg
Kennedy Berg LLP
contact info
Claimant
Abdou Baaklini
122 East 42nd Street Suite 606
New York, NY 10168
Represented By
Steven Leigh Kessler
Law Offices Of Steven L. Kessler
contact info
Claimant
Baaklini North America, Inc.
122 East 42nd Street Suite 606
New York, NY 10168
Represented By
Steven Leigh Kessler
Law Offices Of Steven L. Kessler
contact info
Claimant
Cedar Exports Auto Sales, Mt. Juliet, TN
Represented By
Alessandra Deblasio
Alessandra Deblasio, Attorney At Law
contact info
Claimant
Chubb Group Insurance Companies
15 Mountain View Road
Warren, NJ 07059
Represented By
Edward Hayum
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
J. Scott Tarbutton
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Richard C. Bennett
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Sean P. Carter
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Cozen
Cozen O'Connor (philadelphia)
contact info
Stephen A. Miller
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Claimant
Cybamar Swiss GMBH
Represented By
James Thomas Bacon
Allred, Bacon, Halfhill & Young, P.C.
contact info
Claimant
Dealer Services Corporation
Represented By
Joseph B. Schmit
Phillips Lytle Llp (madison Ave.)
contact info
Counter Claimant
All Assets of Hassan Ayash Exchange Company
Represented By
Damira Kamchibekova
Kalbian Hagerty L.L.P
contact info
James Thomas Bacon
Allred, Bacon, Halfhill & Young, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Abdou Baaklini
Represented By
Steven Leigh Kessler
Law Offices Of Steven L. Kessler
contact info
Counter Claimant
Baaklini North America, Inc.
Represented By
Steven Leigh Kessler
Law Offices Of Steven L. Kessler
contact info
Counter Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Jason Harris Cowley
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Alexander Joshua Wilson
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Sharon Cohen Levin
contact info
Michael Dennis Lockard
United States Attorney Office, Sdny
contact info
Defendant
Jean Y. Chedid Trading Est
Represented By
Vinoo P. Varghese
Varghese & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Esther Ann Nguonly
Varghese & Asscoaites, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kassab Auto Dealer LLC
Defendant
Kamal Al Khawand
Defendant
Lebanese Canadian Bank SAL
Represented By
Evan T. Barr
Steptoe & Johnson, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Christopher J. Clark
Latham & Watkins Llp (ny)
contact info
Elisabeth L. Page
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Sandra Elaine Cavazos
Steptoe & Johnson, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
MGM Global Trading LLC
Represented By
Tristan Scott Cowperthwait
Pullman & Comley, Llc (bridgeport)
contact info
Defendant
Mansour Brothers Auto Trading Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Peter Shusta
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Myles Auto Sales
Defendant
Poliproject Inc.
Represented By
Isaac Garcia-Dale
Dwyer & Brennan
contact info
Thomas E. Dwyer
Dwyer Partners LLP
contact info
Defendant
STE Marco SARL
Defendant
STE Nomeco SARL
Defendant
Safari Enterprises LLC
Represented By
Timothy Peter Shusta
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sahari Motors
Represented By
Timothy Peter Shusta
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Salhab Travel Agency
Defendant
United Auto Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By
Henry Edward Mazurek
Clayman & Rosenberg, LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Arnone
Arnone Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
United Quality Auto Sales Inc.
Represented By
Joseph R. Arnone
Arnone Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
World Auto Sales LL
Represented By
Anthony Aaron Joseph
Maynard Cooper & Gale P.C.
contact info
Defendant
A&J Auto Sales Inc.
Represented By
Nabih Hussein Ayad
Nabih H. Ayad & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ARZ Export LLC
Represented By
David Christopher Driscoll, Jr.
Stein Sperling Bennett De Jong Driscoll PC
contact info
Jeffrey Martin Schwaber
Stein Sperling, Bennett, De Jong, Driscoll & Greenfeig, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ace Auto Leasing Inc.
Defendant
Auto Care LLC
Defendant
Auto Rama, Inc.
Represented By
Eric M. Nemeth
Varnum LLP
contact info
Lawrence J. Murphy
Varnum, Riddering, Schmidt & Howlett, LLP
contact info
Bradley S. Defoe
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Baaklini North America Inc.
Defendant
Car UZD and Mid Overseas Inc.
Represented By
David S. Weinstein
Clarke Silvergate, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Cary Auto Sales Inc.
Represented By
R. Daniel Boyce
Nexsen Pruet
contact info
Defendant
Cedar Exports Auto Sales
Defendant
Cybamar Swiss GMBH
Defendant
Cybamar Swiss GMBH, LLC
Represented By
Henry Edward Mazurek
Clayman & Rosenberg, LLP
contact info
James Thomas Bacon
Allred, Bacon, Halfhill & Young, P.C.
contact info
Sefton Smyth
Allred, Bacon, Halfhill & Young, P.C.
contact info
Warner Franklin Young, III
contact info
Defendant
EZ Auto Export LLC
Defendant
Eagle Auto Sales Inc.
Represented By
Alexander Howard Benson
Alexander H. Benson Fields, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Eagle Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By
Alexander Howard Benson
Alexander H. Benson Fields, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Edya Export Import Inc.
Defendant
Ellissa Holding Company
Represented By
D. Michelle Douglas
Kalbian Hagerty LLP
contact info
Robert Lee Jenkins
Bynum & Jenkins
contact info
Mark A. Barondess
Kalbian Hagerty LLP
contact info
Aaron W. Knights
Kalbian Hagerty LLP
contact info
James Thomas Bacon
Allred, Bacon, Halfhill & Young, P.C.
contact info
Haig V. Kalbian
Kalbian Hagerty L.L.P
contact info
Defendant
Ezedine Brothers LLC
Defendant
Global Auto LLC
Defendant
Global Shiiping Services Inc.
Represented By
Neil B. Mooney
The Mooney Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Global Shipping Services, Inc.
Represented By
Neil B. Mooney
The Mooney Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
H & D Export and Import Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Peter Shusta
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Defendant
HH Automotive Inc.
Represented By
Elias Muawad
Law Offices Of Elias Muawad, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Bassam G. Hanna
Defendant
Hassan Ayash Exchange Company
Represented By
D. Michelle Douglas
Kalbian Hagerty LLP
contact info
Mark A. Barondess
Kalbian Hagerty LLP
contact info
Aaron W. Knights
Kalbian Hagerty LLP
contact info
James Thomas Bacon
Allred, Bacon, Halfhill & Young, P.C.
contact info
Haig V. Kalbian
Kalbian Hagerty L.L.P
contact info
Defendant
Hijazi General Trading LLC
Defendant-in-Rem
Kasaab Auto Dealer LLC
Represented By
Scott Andrew Resnik
Katten Muchin Rosenman,llp(nyc)
contact info
Emily Stern
Katten Muchin Rosenman,llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
MGM Global Trading LLC
Defendant-in-Rem Pullman & Comley, LLC 850 Main Street
Bridgeport, CT 06604
Represented By
Tristan Scott Cowperthwait
Pullman & Comley, Llc (bridgeport)
contact info
Alex V. Hernandez
Pullman & Comley, Llc(stamford)
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
United Quality Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph R. Arnone
Arnone Law Offices
contact info
Elias Muawad
Law Offices Of Elias Muawad, P.C.
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
World Auto Sales, LLC
Represented By
Anthony Aaron Joseph
Maynard Cooper & Gale P.C.
contact info
Alan Frederick Enslen
Maynard Cooper & Gale P.C.
contact info
Erica Williamson Barnes
Maynard Cooper & Gale P.C.
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
A & J Auto Sales Inc. Lancing MI
Represented By
Nabih Hussein Ayad
Nabih H. Ayad & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
All Assets of 30 Used Car Buyers in the United States Listed in Schedule A,
Defendant-in-Rem
All Assets of Cybamar Swiss GMBH, LLC, STE Marco SARL, STE Nomeco SARL, and The Salhab Travel Agency
Defendant-in-Rem
All Assets of Ellissa Holding Company
Represented By
Robert Lee Jenkins
Bynum & Jenkins
contact info
Damira Kamchibekova
Kalbian Hagerty L.L.P
contact info
James Thomas Bacon
Allred, Bacon, Halfhill & Young, P.C.
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
All Assets of Hassan Ayash Exchange Company
Represented By
Damira Kamchibekova
Kalbian Hagerty L.L.P
contact info
James Thomas Bacon
Allred, Bacon, Halfhill & Young, P.C.
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
All Assets of Lebanese Canadian Bank Sal or Assets Traceable Thereto
Defendant-in-Rem
Auto Care LLC
Represented By
Scott Andrew Resnik
Katten Muchin Rosenman,llp(nyc)
contact info
Emily Stern
Katten Muchin Rosenman,llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
Car UZD and Mid Overseas, Inc.
Represented By
David S. Weinstein
Clarke Silvergate, P.A.
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
Cedar Exports Auto Sales, Mt. Juliet, TN
Represented By
Alessandra Deblasio
Alessandra Deblasio, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
EZ Auto Export LLC
Represented By
Scott Andrew Resnik
Katten Muchin Rosenman,llp(nyc)
contact info
Emily Stern
Katten Muchin Rosenman,llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
Ezedine Brothers LLC
Represented By
Scott Andrew Resnik
Katten Muchin Rosenman,llp(nyc)
contact info
Emily Stern
Katten Muchin Rosenman,llp(nyc)
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
HH Automotive Inc.
Represented By
Elias Muawad
Law Offices Of Elias Muawad, P.C.
contact info
Defendant-in-Rem
Hijazi General Trading, LLC
Represented By
Deane A. Shure
Joseph J. D'Erasmo & Associates
contact info
Joseph John D'Erasmo
Joseph J. D'Erasmo & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Jason Harris Cowley
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Alexander Joshua Wilson
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Sharon Cohen Levin
contact info
Michael Dennis Lockard
United States Attorney Office, Sdny
contact info

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, October 21, 2013
479 479 ORDER: terminating473 Motion to Strike. The Court has approved the parties' Stipulation and Order withdrawing the insurance companies' claims. The Clerk of Court is therefore respectfully directed to terminate the motion at docket number 473, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/21/2013) (djc)
Related: [-]
478 478 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the United States of America, through its attorney, Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Sharon Cohen Levin, Michael D. Lockard, Jason H. Cowley, and Alexander J. Wilson, Assistant United States Attorneys, of counsel, the Insurance Company Claimants and their counsel of record, Sean P. Carter, Esq., of Cozen O'Connor and the Peterson Claimants and their counsel of record, Liviu Vogel. Esq. of Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman Broudy LLP, as follows: 1. The American Insurance Claimants hereby withdraw the American Insurance Claim. 2. One Beacon hereby withdraws the One Beacon Claim. 3. The Chubb Claimants hereby withdraw the Chubb Claim.4. The Peterson Claimants hereby withdraw the Peterson Claim. 5. The American Insurance Claim, the One Beacon Claim, the Chubb Claim and thePeterson Claim are dismissed with prejudice. 6. The Subject Defendant Property is forfeited to the United States in its entirety. 7. The Judgment Claimants are hereby barred from asserting any claims against the United States or any of its agents and employees (including, without limitation, the Drug Enforcement Administration ("DEA") and the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York ("USAO-SDNY") in connection with or arising out of the United States' seizure, restraint, and/or constructive possession of the Defendant Property, including the Subject Defendant Property; including. without limitation, any claim that the United States did not have probable cause to seize, restrain, and/or forfeit the Defendant Property. that the Judgment Claimants are prevailing parties, or that the Judgment Claimants' are entitled to attorneys' fees or any award of interest. 8. Each party waives all rights to appeal or to otherwise challenge or contest the validity of this Stipulation and Order. 9. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. 10. The signature pages of this Stipulation and Order may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. Signature pages may be by fax or by.pdf file and such signatures shall be deemed as valid originals. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/21/2013) (djc) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
Related: [-]
477 477 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: 1. The claims for civil money laundering penalties against the Salhab Travel Agency, STE Marco SAL, and STE Nomeco SAL in the Amended Verified Complaint are hereby dismissed. 2. The claims for forfeiture of all assets of the Salhab Travel Agency, STE Marco SAL, and STE Nomeco in the Amended Verified Complaint are hereby dismissed. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall forward four certified copies of this Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Assistant United States Attorney, Alexander J. Wilson, United States Attorney's Office, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/21/2013) (djc) Modified on 10/21/2013 (djc).
Related: [-]
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:477 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (djc)
Related: [-]
Mailed four certified copies of477 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed, to Assistant United States Attorney, Alexander 1. Wilson, United States Attorney's Office, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. (sdi)
Related: [-]
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (djc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2013
476 476 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Alexander J. Wilson dated October 18, 2013 re: Stipulation and Order and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Document filed by United States of America.(Wilson, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B