Douglass Hayden Fisher
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Kevin R Huennekens |
Case #: | 3:11-bk-34998 |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2011 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 20, 2013 |
Converted: | May 02, 2013 |
Dismissed: | Nov 14, 2013 |
Debtor
Douglass Hayden Fisher
2401 W Main St
Richmond, VA 23220-4436 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Sherman B. Lubman
P.O. Box 5757
Glen Allen, VA 23058 |
|
Trustee
Robert E. Hyman
P.O. Box 1780
Richmond, VA 23218 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins, 11
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Suite 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/15/2013 4:44 AM EST |
Wednesday, August 03, 2011 | ||
1 | 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 13 filed by Ronald Allen Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of Douglass Hayden Fisher (Page, Ronald) | |
2 | 2 U.S. Treasury receipt of Voluntary Petition under Chapter 13 11-34998 [caseupld,5002] ( 274.00) filing fee. Receipt number 12652843, amount $ 274.00. (U.S. Treasury) | |
3 | 3 LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement and 3015-2 Chapter 13 Plan and Related Motions Deficiency; Plan Due 8/17/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 8/17/2011. (Jones, Diane) |