Maria Banuelos v. UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02408 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2015 10:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Deborah C Saxe
JAMS Arbitration Mediation and ADR Services 555 West Fifth Street 32nd Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90013 |
|
Plaintiff
Maria Banuelos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
Fri 02/26 5:24 PM
BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in the amount of $4,909.80 in favor of Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc. and against Plaintiff Maria Banuelos. RE: First APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Maria Banuelos35 (nl) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
Thu 01/14 10:04 AM
First APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Maria Banuelos filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Naylor, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 01/04 10:33 AM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER Judge Percy Anderson:the Court concludes that UPS is entitled to summary judgment on all of Plaintiff's FEHA and wage and hour claims. The Court therefore grants UPS's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will issue a separate Judgment consistent with this Order. (jp) |
|
33 | 33
judgmentCV
Judgment
Mon 01/04 10:31 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant shall have judgment in its favor against Plaintiff. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff take nothing and that Defendant shall have its costs of suit. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 12/30 11:58 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Percy Anderson. On the Court's own motion, the Court vacates the hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment24 , previously scheduled for 1/4/2016 at 1:30 p.m. No appearance is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) |
|
Monday, December 21, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Lodging
Mon 12/21 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Reply (Motion related)30(Naylor, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Reply to Plaintiff's Genuine Issues in Opposition to MSJ | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 12/21 3:37 PM
REPLY Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Rule 56 24 filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Naylor, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
27
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/14 9:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Rule 56 24 filed by Plaintiff Maria Banuelos.(Adamson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 12/09 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Statement (Motion related)25 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),,26 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)27 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Rule 56 24(Burns, C) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix | ||
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Tue 12/08 3:15 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY re: Statement (Motion related)25 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 12/15/2015. (smo) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 12/07 11:21 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Statement (Motion related)25 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Local Rule 56-1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and/or proposed Judgment lacking. The correct event is: Notice of Lodging under NOTICES. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (cr) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Statement (Motion related)
Tue 12/01 3:13 PM
STATEMENT of Statement of Uncontroverted Facts NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Rule 56 24 filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc..(Naylor, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
24 | 24
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 12/01 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Rule 56 filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Naylor, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
Mon 11/23 12:34 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Deborah C Saxe: Mediation held on November 17, 2015. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Killefer, Gail) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/22 11:13 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson: granting19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney C. Christine Burns on behalf of Defendant, designating Laura A. Freeman as local counsel. (lt) |
|
21 | 21
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/21 4:42 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson: granting18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin J. Naylor on behalf of Defendant, designating Laura A. Freeman as local counsel. (lt) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Tue 07/21 12:39 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION for attorney C. Christine Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16114198 paid.)19 , First APPLICATION for attorney Benjamin John Naylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16113765 paid.)18 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. See LR 83-2.1.3.4. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/20 3:03 PM
First APPLICATION for attorney C. Christine Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16114198 paid.) filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Freeman, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/20 2:47 PM
First APPLICATION for attorney Benjamin John Naylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16113765 paid.) filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Freeman, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Mon 07/13 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Deborah C Saxe has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Tue 07/07 11:28 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Deborah Crandall Saxe may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Maria Banuelos(Adamson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Fri 06/19 1:27 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This matter is set for trial before the Honorable Percy Anderson. See document regarding the Court's procedures and requirements for civil trials. (gk) |
|
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/19 1:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson: Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of 12/28/2015. Setting Motion Cut-off date of 1/4/2016. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for 2/5/2016 at 1:30 PM. Setting Jury Trial Date of 3/8/2016 at 9:00 AM. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/18 2:35 PM
MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. This case is referred to the Court's Mediation Panel. Within 21 days, the parties must obtain the consent of a Panel Mediator who will conduct the mediation, and file form ADR-2, Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation 3/3/2016. Hearing on Motions in Limine and Hearing on Disputed Jury Instructions at 1:30 PM 2/29/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/5/2016. Proposed Voir Dire Questions & Agreed-to Statement of Case 2/5/2016. Lodge Pretrial Conference Order & Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation by 1/22/2016. File Contentions of Fact & Law 1/22/2016. Exhibit List due by 1/22/2016. Witness List due by 1/22/2016. File Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement by 1/22/2016. File Agreed Upon Set of Instructions & Verdict Forms 1/22/2016. File Joint Statement Regarding Disputed Instructions, Verdicts, etc. 1/22/2016. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/11/2016. Last Day for Hearing Motions 1/4/2016. Discovery cut-off 12/28/2015. Last Day for Hearing on Motion to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties 8/24/2015. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 06/12 4:10 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc... (Freeman, Laura) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 06/04 2:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The parties have not filed the Joint Scheduling Report required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), Local Rule 26, and the Courts Order Scheduling Meeting of Counsel and Setting Scheduling Conference dated April 7, 2015. Although the parties submitted a Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge on May 27, 2015, that is not a substitute for filing the Joint Scheduling Report. The Court orders the parties to submit their Joint Scheduling Report by no later than June 12, 2015. The failure to submit a joint report by that date may result in the dismissal of the action, striking the answer and entering default, and/or the imposition of sanctions. (smo) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program
Thu 06/04 2:42 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 12-01 is denied by Percy Anderson, District Judge. This case shall remain assigned to the District Judge. (smo) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Thu 05/28 11:06 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Maria Banuelos.(Adamson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Consent | ||
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Wed 05/27 5:03 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Maria Banuelos.(Adamson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Consent | ||
Tuesday, April 07, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/07 7:14 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL by Judge Percy Anderson,, Set deadlines and hearings( Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (pj) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 04/07 7:11 PM
STANDING ORDER READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASEAND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. by Judge Percy Anderson, (pj) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Mon 04/06 8:38 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 14-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV15-02408 PA (AJWx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. (mg) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form
Thu 04/02 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): (1) CIVIL COVER SHEET should have been filed as a separate entry under its own event; (2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT / NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES should have been filed under the correct events, not under NOTICE (OTHER). No further action is required regarding these items. (esa) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 04/02 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (esa) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/01 4:14 PM
NOTICE Defendant's Corporate Disclosure and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Freeman, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/01 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles - Central District, case number BC541487 Receipt No: 0973-15476825 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Attorney Laura A Freeman added to party UPS Ground Freight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Freeman, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Laura Freeman | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 04/02 11:00 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT, Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles Case BC541487 against defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, UPS Ground Freight, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Maria Banuelos. (esa) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 04/02 11:03 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.(esa) |