Jones #219406 v. Sage et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00360 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
defendant
G. Sage
|
|
defendant
Unknown Rowland
|
|
plaintiff
Daron Jones #219406
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
49 | 49
order
Judgment
Fri 09/29 11:19 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of defendant and against plaintiff; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
48 | 48
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding Report and Recommendation
Fri 09/29 11:18 AM
ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION47 ; granting motion for summary judgment45 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 09/29 2:04 PM
Certified Copy of Judgment49 , Order Regarding Report and Recommendation48 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 08/31 8:02 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re45 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green(Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 08/31 10:37 AM
Copy of Report and Recommendation47 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 03/28 10:45 AM
Copy of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment44 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
respm
Brief in Support of a Motion
Mon 03/27 1:31 PM
BRIEF in support of AMENDED MOTION for summary judgment 45 filed by G. Sage (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Critical Incident Report (redacted), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Deposition of Daron Jones, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Jennett Rowland, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Misconduct Hearing Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Policy Directive 03.03.105, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Video Footage on CD from Bellamy Creek Correctional Facility (Filed in the Traditional Manner and Under Seal), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Captain Patrick Makara, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Grant Sage | ||
45 | 45
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 03/27 1:22 PM
AMENDED MOTION for summary judgment by defendant G. Sage; (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 03/24 3:13 PM
ORDER dismissing without prejudice36 motion for summary judgment; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Brief (Related Document)
Tue 03/07 10:06 AM
BRIEF by plaintiff Daron Jones #219406 re42 (ns) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
42 | 42
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 03/07 10:05 AM
RESPONSE TO MOTION for summary judgment 36 filed by Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Fri 02/24 10:31 AM
ORDER granting38 motion to seal; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 02/24 3:18 PM
Copy of Order on Motion to Seal41 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Sealed Document
Thu 02/23 2:20 PM
PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT by defendant G. Sage re MOTION for summary judgment 36 , MOTION to SEAL Exhibit 38 (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
39 | 39
respm
Brief in Support of a Motion
Thu 02/23 2:17 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL Exhibit 38 filed by G. Sage (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Seal
Thu 02/23 2:15 PM
MOTION to SEAL Exhibit by defendant G. Sage; (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
37 | 37
respm
Brief in Support of a Motion
Thu 02/23 2:13 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for summary judgment 36 filed by G. Sage (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Critical Incident Report (redacted), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Deposition of Daron Jones, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Jennett Rowland, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Misconduct Hearing Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Policy Directive 03.03.105, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Video Footage on CD Filed In Traditional Manner and Under Seal, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Captain Patrick Makara, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Grant Sage | ||
36 | 36
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 02/23 2:04 PM
MOTION for summary judgment by defendant G. Sage; (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Fri 02/17 11:09 AM
WITHDRAWAL by defendant G. Sage of MOTION to compel and for Sanctions 31 filed by G. Sage (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 02/06 4:50 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to compel and for Sanctions 31 filed by Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Change of Address - Prisoner or Pro Se
Mon 02/06 4:48 PM
CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Daron Jones #219406 to 10421 Cadieux, Apt. 19 Detroit, MI 48224 (ns) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Brief in Support of a Motion
Wed 01/25 3:24 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel and for Sanctions 31 filed by G. Sage (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A Notice of Deposition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B Shipping Label, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C Notice of Delivery, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D Deposition Transcript and Invoice | ||
31 | 31
motion
Compel
Wed 01/25 3:19 PM
MOTION to compel and for Sanctions by defendant G. Sage; (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Magistrate-Referred Complaint
Wed 10/26 11:54 AM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses, jury demand, and certificate of service by G. Sage (Fracassi, Adam) Modified text on 10/26/2016 (slk) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Attorney Substitution
Thu 10/20 10:51 AM
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION adding attorney Adam L.S. Fracassi in the place of Kevin R. Himebaugh (Fracassi, Adam) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 10/20 10:38 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James E. Long on behalf of defendant G. Sage (Long, James) |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Case Management Order (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)
Wed 09/28 9:53 AM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 09/28 1:46 PM
Copy of Case Management Order (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)28 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
||
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 09/26 3:14 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part13 motion for summary judgment; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) |
|
26 | 26
10
pgs
order
Opinion
Mon 09/26 3:13 PM
OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 09/26 3:41 PM
Copy of Opinion26 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment27 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
||
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
utility
Error Correction
Fri 12/11 9:39 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) was filed in error and should be disregarded (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, mil) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document)
Thu 12/10 2:50 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for summary judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 13 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, mil) |
||
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
service
Proof of Service
Mon 08/31 1:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Daron Jones #219406 re Signature Page24 (ald) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Signature Page
Mon 08/31 1:13 PM
SIGNATURE PAGE submitted by plaintiff Daron Jones #219406 for Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper21 , Response to Motion18 (ald) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 08/14 1:19 PM
Copy of Conditional Orders Striking Pleading21 ,22 ,23 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (clp) |
||
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper
Thu 08/13 5:03 PM
CONDITIONAL ORDER striking Certificate of Service20 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green(Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
22 | 22
order
Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper
Thu 08/13 4:58 PM
CONDITIONAL ORDER striking Brief 19 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green(Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
21 | 21
order
Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper
Thu 08/13 3:44 PM
CONDITIONAL ORDER striking Response to Motion18 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green(Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/11 11:49 AM
UNSIGNED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Daron Jones #219406 re Response to Motion18 , Brief 19 (clp) Modified text on 8/11/2015 (clp) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Brief (Related Document)
Tue 08/11 11:48 AM
UNSIGNED BRIEF by plaintiff Daron Jones #219406 re18 (clp) Modified text on 8/11/2015 (clp) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-3 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 08/11 11:41 AM
UNSIGNED RESPONSE TO MOTION for summary judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 13 filed by Daron Jones #219406 (clp) Modified text on 8/11/2015 (clp) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/23 3:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Rowland, G. Sage re MOTION for summary judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 13 , Brief in Support of a Motion,14 Index of Exhibits, and Exhibits 1 and 2 (Himebaugh, Kevin) |
|
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/23 2:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Daron Jones #219406 re Change of Address - Prisoner or Pro Se15 (ns) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Change of Address - Prisoner or Pro Se
Thu 07/23 2:45 PM
CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Daron Jones #219406 to 3011 W Grand Blvd., Ste. 230, Detroit, MI 48202 (ns) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Brief in Support of a Motion
Mon 07/20 1:47 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for summary judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 13 , Index of Exhibits, and Exhibits 1 and 2 filed by Unknown Rowland, G. Sage (Himebaugh, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1--PD 03.02.130, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2--Certified Copy, MDOC Step III Grievance Report, with Attached Grievances | ||
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 07/20 1:45 PM
MOTION for summary judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by defendants Unknown Rowland, G. Sage; (Himebaugh, Kevin) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Mon 06/29 10:24 AM
ORDER granting7 motion to strike; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
10 | 10
order
Case Management Order (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)
Mon 06/29 10:17 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 06/29 1:13 PM
Copy of Order on Motion to Strike11 , Case Management Order (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)10 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (ns) |
||
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/25 1:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Rowland, G. Sage re Attorney Appearance, MOTION to strike Dk. 5 From the Record 7 , Brief in Support of a Motion8 , Index of Exhibits, and Exhibit 1 (Himebaugh, Kevin) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Brief in Support of a Motion
Thu 06/25 1:10 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to strike Dk. 5 From the Record 7 , Index of Exhibits, and Exhibit 1 filed by G. Sage (Himebaugh, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1--Executed Waiver of Def Sage | ||
7 | 7
motion
Strike
Thu 06/25 1:08 PM
MOTION to strike Dk. 5 From the Record by defendant G. Sage; (Himebaugh, Kevin) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 06/25 1:06 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kevin R. Himebaugh on behalf of defendants Unknown Rowland, G. Sage (identified as Jennett Rowland and Grant Sage) (Himebaugh, Kevin) |
||
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/27 1:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Unknown Rowland waiver sent on 5/8/2015, answer due 7/7/2015 (ald) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 05/26 10:01 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to G. Sage waiver sent on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015 (ald) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2015 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 05/07 10:35 AM
Copy of Order Regarding Service - Prisoner4 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (clp) |
||
service
Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service delivered to USM
Thu 05/07 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendants Unknown Rowland, G. Sage (clp) |
||
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Regarding Service - Prisoner
Wed 05/06 4:45 PM
ORDER REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner
Thu 04/16 2:02 PM
ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $.32 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 04/16 3:31 PM
Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner,3 sent via U.S. Mail to Daron Jones #219406 (ald) |
||
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Fri 04/03 4:17 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (jlg) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint with Magistrate Referral
Fri 04/03 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Unknown Rowland, G. Sage filed by Daron Jones #219406 (jlg) |