Veros Energy, LLC
Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jennifer H Henderson |
Case #: | 7:15-bk-70470 |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 05, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Sep 16, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Veros Energy, LLC
12982 Cherokee Bnd
Moundville, AL 35474-6226 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Unsecured Creditors' Committee
Kristofor D. Sodergren P.O. Box 2727
Tuscaloosa, AL 35403 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago |