American Civil Liberties Union v. Department of Health and Human Services et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Crotty |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-02645 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552b(g)sa Implement requirements of Govt in Sunshine Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 6:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Administration for Children and Families
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Civil Liberties Union
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Fri 07/15 12:21 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, as follows: 1. Pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(E), the Government shall pay to Plaintiff the sum of $23,000.00 (TWENTY-THREE THOUSAND DOLLARS) in attorneys' fees and litigation costs (the "Settlement Amount"), which sum Plaintiff agrees to accept in full satisfaction of any possible claim, demand or entitlement for attorneys' fees and costs Plaintiff has incurred or will incur in this action. 2. In consideration for, and effective upon, payment of the Settlement Amount set forth in the preceding paragraph, Plaintiff releases the United States, its agencies, departments, officers, employees, servants, and agents, including the Department of Health and Human Services and the Administration for Children and Families, from any claims for attorney's fees, costs, and expenses of any kind, and however denominated, relating to services performed in connection with this instant action as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/15/2016) (lmb) (Main Document 32 replaced on 7/15/2016) (lmb) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 06/22 5:44 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that the parties have reached a settlement, it is, ORDERED, that the above-entitled action be and hereby is dismissed, without prejudice and costs to either party, subject to reopening should the settlement not be consummated within thirty (30) days of the date hereof. The Court will sign a Stipulation and Order of Settlement upon receipt from either party. In the event the parties require more than the 30 days to finalize the settlement, either party shall file a letter motion on ECF requesting such relief. Any application for an extension or to reopen must be filed within 30 days of this Order; any application for an extension or to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. The Clerk of Court is directed to te1minate this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/22/2016) (mt) |
|
Monday, June 20, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Mon 06/20 5:59 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated June 20, 2016 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Memo Endorsement
Thu 05/19 6:11 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:28 Letter filed by Department of Health and Human Services, Administration for Children and Families. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/19/2016) (lmb) |
|
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Wed 05/18 5:15 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated May 18, 2016 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Memo Endorsement
Wed 03/23 1:45 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:26 Letter filed by Department of Health and Human Services, Administration for Children and Families. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/23/2016) (lmb) |
|
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Fri 03/18 5:22 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated March 18, 2016 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Memo Endorsement
Thu 01/21 2:54 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:24 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated January 19, 2016 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/21/2016) (rjm) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Tue 01/19 5:48 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated January 19, 2016 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Monday, December 21, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Memo Endorsement
Mon 12/21 3:50 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:22 Letter filed by Department of Health and Human Services, Administration for Children and Families. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/21/2015) (lmb) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Wed 12/16 6:29 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated December 16, 2015 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Memo Endorsement
Tue 11/17 6:34 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:20 Letter filed by Department of Health and Human Services, Administration for Children and Families. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/17/2015) (lmb) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Mon 11/16 2:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated November 16, 2015 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Mon 10/19 11:04 AM
ORDER granting doc entry # 18. Status Report Letter - Request to submit a status report on 11-16-15 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Fri 10/16 2:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated October 16, 2015 re: Joint status report. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 07/29 11:11 AM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The 8-4-15 IPTC is marked off sine die. The parties are directed to file a status report letter on or before Friday, October 16, 2015. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 07/28 6:55 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated July 28, 2015. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 07/20 7:34 AM
NOTICE of IPTC: The Initial Pretrial Conference is scheduled to go forward on: Tuesday, August 4, 2015, at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 14-C, 500 Pearl Street, before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. The submission of the proposed civil case management plan (attached & can be found on the SDNY website) and joint letter, pursuant to Rule 6G of Judge Crotty's Individual Practices (attached & can also be found on the SDNY website), due two business days prior to the conference. The joint letter should be filed on ECF in accordance with the ECF filing instructions as opposed to e-mailing the documents to the Court. The proposed civil case management plan should be filed on ECF as an "exhibit / proposed order" to the joint letter. If the date is not convenient, either party can e-mail three (3) mutually convenient dates to the Courtroom Deputy at: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov (By: Marlon Ovalles, Courtroom Deputy).(mov) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Individual Practices of Judge Crotty, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Civil Case Management Plan | ||
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/10 5:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/05 2:27 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. A 30 day extension from June 8, 2015 to July 10, 2015 (not 8-10-15) to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/05 11:51 AM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated June 5, 2015. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Bergman, Jacob) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/01 10:56 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Brian Hauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/28 3:16 PM
MOTION for Brian Hauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10967558. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(Hauss, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Thu 05/28 3:20 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 MOTION for Brian Hauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10967558. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi) |
||
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/06 4:12 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (due by 6-8-15). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (Crotty, Paul) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 05/06 3:52 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Monica P. Folch dated May 6, 2015. Document filed by Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services.(Folch, Monica) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/27 5:13 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Amiri, Brigitte) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/27 5:03 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Administration for Children and Families served on 4/7/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Amiri, Brigitte) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service as to USA
Mon 04/27 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Department of Health and Human Services served on 4/7/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Amiri, Brigitte) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/27 4:30 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Administration for Children and Families served on 4/7/2012, answer due 6/6/2012. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Amiri, Brigitte) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
utility
Case Declined as Not Related
Mon 04/20 8:50 AM
CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 08cv9908 and declined by Judge Paul G. Gardephe and returned to wheel for assignment. (pgu) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Mon 04/20 8:50 AM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/20 8:50 AM
Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (pgu) |
||
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Mon 04/06 2:29 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 08-cv-9908. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(rdz) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/06 2:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/06 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401121858)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(rdz) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/06 2:13 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Administration for Children and Families, Department of Health and Human Services. (rdz) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Mon 04/06 2:27 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly similar to 08-cv-9908. (rdz) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/06 2:28 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |