|
GPO
Mar 23 2016
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 8 Petitioner's Omnibus Motion, recommending that the district judge should deny without prejudice all of the relief requested in the motion. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 4/11/2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jbw)
|
|
GPO
May 25 2016
ORDER approving 12 Report and Recommendation; denying without prejudice 8 Petitioner's Omnibus Motion. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(vln)
|
|
GPO
Dec 20 2016
K. Johnstone.(jbw)REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the district judge deny the respondent's 18 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice, and deny as moot petitioner's 24 Motion for More Definite Statement and 26 MOTION to Bar and Preclude Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 1/3/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea
|
|
GPO
Jan 30 2017
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 38 Motion for Summary Judgment - recommending the district judge dissolve the temporary restraining order (doc. no. 32) issued August 10, 2016, and deny Towle's motions for preliminary injunction (doc. no. 31) and for summary judgment as to injunctive relief (doc. no. 38), without prejudice. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 2/13/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jbw)
|
|
GPO
Feb 02 2017
/// ORDER approving 50 Report and Recommendation; denying without prejudice 18 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 24 Motion for More Definite Statement and denying as moot 26 Motion for to Bar and Preclude Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for filing a motion for summary judgment in this case is sixty days from the date of this order. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw)
|
|
GPO
Mar 03 2017
ORDER approving 56 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(ko)
|
|
GPO
Jun 06 2017
ORDER granting 75 Petitioner's Motion for Compliance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lat)
|
|
GPO
Jan 16 2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 65 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 67 MOTION to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 91 MOTION to Amend Petition II, recommending the district judge should deny in part Mr. Towle's motions to amend as set forth therein. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 1/30/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jbw)
|
|
GPO
Feb 15 2018
ORDER approving 100 Report and Recommendation dated January 16, 2018, denying in part 65 Motion to Amend Petition; denying in part 67 Motion to Amend Petition, and denying in part 91 Motion to Amend MOTION to Amend Petition II. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw)
|
|
GPO
Feb 15 2018
/// ORDER approving 100 Report and Recommendation dated January 16, 2018, denying in part 65 Motion to Amend Petition; denying in part 67 Motion to Amend Petition, and denying in part 91 Motion to Amend MOTION to Amend Petition II. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw) Modified on 4/3/2018 to add three slashes. (jbw).
|
|
GPO
Feb 22 2018
iary Hearing, and denying without prejudice 102 Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Deadline for Objection to 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw)/// ORDER approving the 108 Report and Recommendation dated February 1, 2018; denying without prejudice 72 Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 78 Petitioner's Motion for Evident
|
|
GPO
Nov 19 2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 122 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, recommending the district judge deny Towle's motion for preliminary injunction. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 12/3/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (lml)
|
|
GPO
Dec 04 2018
ORDER approving 131 Report and Recommendation; denying 122 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jbw)
|
|
GPO
Sep 30 2019
///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is granted as to Claims 25 and 27, and is otherwise denied. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
|
|
GPO
Sep 30 2019
ORDER: The respondents motion for summary judgment as to Claims 15 through 27 (Doc. No. 133) is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: a. the motion is granted as to Claims 15 through 19, and 26; b. the motion is denied without prejudice as to Claims 20 through 24; and c. the motion is denied as moot as to Claims 25 and 27. The respondents motion for summary judgment as to Claims 1 through 14 (Doc. No. 139) is granted. The court will issue a separate order with briefing instructions as to Claims 20 through 24. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)
|