Robert A. Damon v. Korn Ferry International et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Manuel L Real |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02640 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2015 6:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Gary D Burnison
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Korn Ferry International
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert A Damon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Receipt
Thu 06/11 2:13 PM
Receipt of Acknowledgement of remand documents by Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Thu 05/21 10:26 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk) |
|
18 | 18
order
Dismiss Remand Case to State Court
Thu 05/21 10:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand12 is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss11 is DENIED as moot. Case remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC574970. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (gk) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 05/13 3:09 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss11 and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand12 set for hearing on May 18, 2015 at 10:00 A.M., are suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties, without the need for oral argument; therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed, and the hearing date of May 18, 2015 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/04 5:43 PM
REPLY In Support of MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 filed by Plaintiff Robert A Damon.(Waldo, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Rafael Tumanyan in Support of Reply | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/04 4:49 PM
REPLY in support of First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Tenth, Eleventh, and Twelfth Causes of Action 11 filed by Defendant Korn Ferry International.(Bloom, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Katherine V.A. Smith | ||
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 04/27 6:05 PM
Opposition to re: MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 filed by Defendant Korn Ferry International.(Bloom, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Aaron H. Bloom | ||
13 | 13
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 04/27 3:48 PM
Opposition re: First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Tenth, Eleventh, and Twelfth Causes of Action 11 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Robert A Damon.(Waldo, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration OF RAFAEL N. TUMANYAN IN SUPPORT OF (1) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; AND (2) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF LEGISLATIVE HISTORY FOR CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE § 1102.5 | ||
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Mon 04/20 10:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Robert A Damon. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(Waldo, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF RAFAEL N. TUMANYAN, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND | ||
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 04/16 9:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Seventh, Tenth, Eleventh, and Twelfth Causes of Action filed by Defendant Korn Ferry International. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(Bloom, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 44 pgs Declaration of Diana M. Feinstein, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 10, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 04/10 3:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Gary D Burnison, Korn Ferry International, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 Declaration of Service by Hand Delivery of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on 04/09/2015. (Bloom, Aaron) |
|
9 | 9
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 04/10 3:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Gary D Burnison, Korn Ferry International, Notice of Assignment to United States Judges served on 04/10/2015.(Bloom, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 04/10 3:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Gary D Burnison, Korn Ferry International, Order re Notice to Counsel served on 04/10/2015.(Bloom, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Notice to Counsel | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 04/10 12:55 PM
ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 04/09 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) |
|
5 | 5
trial
Jury Demand
Thu 04/09 3:57 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial Robert A Damon.. (Tumanyan, Rafael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/09 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robert A Damon, (Tumanyan, Rafael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/09 11:38 AM
Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gary D Burnison, Korn/Ferry International, identifying Robert A. Damon. (Bloom, Aaron) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 04/09 11:35 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Gary D Burnison, Korn/Ferry International. (Bloom, Aaron) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/09 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC574970 Receipt No: 0973-15516731 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Gary D Burnison, Korn/Ferry International. (Attorney Aaron H Bloom added to party Gary D Burnison(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron H Bloom added to party Korn/Ferry International(pty:dft))(Bloom, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 125 pgs Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum, | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service (Korn/Ferry), | ||
Att: 6 OSC hearing notice, | ||
Att: 7 LASC's notice of CMC, | ||
Att: 8 Plaintiff's notice of CMC, | ||
Att: 9 Proof of Service (GDC), | ||
Att: 10 1 pgs Proof of Service (Burnison), | ||
Att: 11 27 pgs Declaration of Linda Hyman | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 04/09 4:02 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Gary D Burnison, Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, Korn Ferry International. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Robert A Damon. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/10/2015 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL.] (et) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 04/09 4:04 PM
NON-CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Robert A Damon, upon Defendant Korn Ferry International served on 3/11/2015, answer due 4/1/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George-Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL.] (et) |