|
GPO
Mar 30 2011
ORDER granting 6 Motion to Consolidate. Lead Case No.: 10-0715-WS-M, Member Case No.: 10-0717-N. All future pleadings are to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-5 from Civil Action No. 10-0717-N and make those documents a part of Civil Action No. 10-0715-WS-M. The Clerk is further directed to statistically close Civil Action No. 10-0717-N. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/30/2011. (tgw)
|
|
GPO
Apr 20 2011
Order re: 13 MOTION to Set Aside Need for International Service or, Alternatively, Motion for Extension of International Service Period. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/20/2011. (tgw)
|
|
GPO
Apr 25 2011
Order granting 16 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time for International Service filed by BBC Chartering & Logistic GmbH & Co. K.G., Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG. BBC and Briese are ordered to file status reports on or before the fourth Tuesday of each month beginning in May. Status Report due by 5/24/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/25/2011. (tgw)
|
|
GPO
Jul 26 2011
ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time; denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion to Supplement the Record. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/26/2011. (tgw)
|
|
GPO
Oct 18 2011
Order re: 56 Amended Motion to Amend Complaint and to Dismiss Sideridraulic System SPA as a Party Plaintiff filed by Sideridraulic System SPA, ThyssenKrupp Steele USA, LLC. Sideridraulic's claims asserted against Briese Schiffahrts are dismissed. Plaintiff is ordered by 10/25/2011 to file its First Amended Complaint. The 59 Motion for Sanctions filed by BBC Chartering & Logistic GmbH & Co. K.G., Briese Schiffahrts GMBH & Co KG is denied. (Sideridraulic System SPA terminated as Plaintiff). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/18/2011. (tgw)
|