Lowery v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-01108 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2015 12:21 PM CDT |
Defendant
AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AstraZeneca LP
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharonda Lowery
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Tue 02/23 2:02 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Sharonda Lowery. (Wall, John) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/23 2:09 PM
Civil Case Terminated per25 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (twd) |
||
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
adr
ADR Summary
Tue 02/02 8:27 AM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: John Wall, Ellen Perlioni. Prv Fee: $ 2950.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Bass, Courtenay) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
trial
Designation of Experts
Fri 11/20 9:57 AM
Designation of Experts by Sharonda Lowery. (Wall, John) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 08/28 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Arthur Correll on behalf of AstraZeneca LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Correll, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order For ADR
Wed 07/29 8:57 AM
MEDIATION ORDER: The court appoints Courtenay L Bass as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to complete the mediation no later than 2/19/2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/29/2015) (ctf) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Tue 07/28 3:43 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT [Joint Report Regarding Recommended Mediator] filed by AstraZeneca LP, Sharonda Lowery. (Perlioni, Ellen) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 07/09 10:41 AM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint,, filed by AstraZeneca LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Perlioni, Ellen) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/25 10:29 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by Sharonda Lowery. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 06/25 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is requested to enter Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (doc. 16-1), currently attached to the motion, as a separate docket entry. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/25/2015) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File
Wed 06/24 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint filed by Sharonda Lowery with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wall, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/24 11:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning 7/18/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 10/22/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2015. Motions due by 4/19/2016. Discovery due by 3/20/2016. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/19/2016. Pretrial Materials due by 7/5/2016. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/5/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/24/2015) (bdb) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 06/23 11:58 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER striking12 Amended Complaint. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), Plaintiff is required to seek leave of court to amend her complaint. See LR 15.1. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/23/2015) (chmb) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/22 3:58 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Sharonda Lowery. (Wall, John) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 06/22 12:03 PM
***STRICKEN PER 14 ORDER*** AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by Sharonda Lowery. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wall, John) Modified docket text on 6/23/2015 (bdb) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Thu 05/21 8:38 AM
Status Report Order: Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2015. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/20/2015) (jrr) |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/19 2:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate AstraZeneca PLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Perlioni, Ellen) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/19 2:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Perlioni, Ellen) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 05/04 8:36 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant's responsive pleading is to be filed on or before May 19, 2015. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/4/2015) (chmb) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/01 4:27 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Perlioni, Ellen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 05/01 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristen Ann Laster on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Laster, Kristen) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 05/01 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen L Perlioni on behalf of AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Perlioni, Ellen) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned
Wed 04/15 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP; served on 4/14/2015. (jrr) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/13 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (skt) |
|
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/13 9:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharonda Lowery. (See document #1 for image.) (skt) |
||
Friday, April 10, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
qcref
Boyle
Mon 04/13 9:54 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Boyle. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/10 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by Sharonda Lowery. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6723680) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wall, John) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 summons, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Interested persons |