United States of America vs. 147,220.02 In U.S. Currency
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dean D Pregerson |
Referred: | Patrick J Walsh |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02673 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Oct 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2015 10:38 AM PDT |
Claimant
Gerard Goryl
3333 West Second Street Suite 52-214
Los Angeles, CA 90004 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
147,220.02 In U.S. Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, June 30, 2021 | ||
55 | 55
service
USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed
Thu 07/01 7:58 AM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Consent Judgment,49 , returned executed upon Gerard Goryl on June 24, 2021. Remarks: All items returned to claimant and his attorney. (shb) |