Tetra Tech, Inc. v. JAAAT Technical Services, LLC
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Randal Hall |
Referred: | Brian K Epps |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00054 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 11, 2015 9:40 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
JAAAT Technical Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Tetra Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Tetra Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
JAAAT Technical Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAAAT Technical Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Tetra Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
JAAAT Technical Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/11 3:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims in this matter. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/11/2016. (thb) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/10 4:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc.. (Hudson, David) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/16 3:03 PM
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER granting33 Joint Motion to extend discovery. Any further extension request must be addressed to the presiding District Judge. Discovery due by 10/26/2016. Motions due by 11/18/2016. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff/Third-Party Plaintiff) due by 8/26/2016. Expert Witness Report (Defendant/Third-Party Defendant) due by 9/26/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/16/2016. (thb) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Mon 02/08 10:47 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:33 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct32 Scheduling Order. (cmr) |
||
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 02/05 5:31 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct32 Scheduling Order, by Tetra Tech, Inc.. Responses due by 2/22/2016.(Hudson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/20 4:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting31 Joint Motion to extend the discovery deadline. Discovery due by 4/26/2016. Motions due by 5/26/2016. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 2/9/2016. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 3/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/20/2015. (thb) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 10/16 12:09 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC. Responses due by 11/2/2015.(Williams, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 10/16 12:34 PM
MOTION REFERRED:31 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. (thb) |
||
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 10/13 1:53 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC.(Williams, Christine) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Third Party Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 09/23 3:44 PM
ANSWER to Third Party Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against JAAAT Technical Services, LLC by Tetra Tech, Inc., Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc..(Hudson, David) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Third Party Complaint
Wed 09/02 2:33 PM
ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Tetra Tech, Inc..(Hudson, David) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 08/14 11:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting the parties'26 Consent Motion to extend the discovery deadlines and in light of the addition of Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc. as a Third-Party Defendant; and extending the deadlines in this case as follows: Last Day for Third-Party Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Third-Party Complaint - September 2, 2015; Last Day for Third-Party Defendant to Furnish Initial Disclosure - September 11, 2015; Last day to Furnish Expert Witness Report by Plaintiff/Third-Party Plaintiff - November 9, 2015; Last Day to Furnish Expert Witness Report by Defendant/Third-Party Defendant - December 9, 2015; Close of Discovery - January 22, 2016; Last Day for Filing Civil Motions Including Daubert Motions, but Excluding Motions in Limine - February 26, 2016. All provisions of the prior Scheduling Order (doc. n. 18) not revised herein shall remain in full forces and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/14/2015. (jah) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 08/14 11:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc. answer due 9/2/2015., Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 11/9/2015. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 12/9/2015. Discovery due by 1/22/2016. Motions due by 2/26/2016. (jah) Modified on 8/14/2015 (jah) |
||
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 08/11 9:42 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc., Tetra Tech, Inc.. Responses due by 8/28/2015.(Hudson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 08/11 10:04 AM
MOTION REFERRED:26 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. (thb) |
||
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 08/04 9:27 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time. The date for Plaintiff to furnish expert witness report is hereby extended to September 9, 2015. The date for Defendant to furnish expert witness report is hereby extended to October 9, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/04/2015. (thb) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/04 9:32 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 9/9/2015. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 10/9/2015. (thb) |
||
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 07/31 4:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Furnish Expert Witness Reports . by Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc., Tetra Tech, Inc.. Responses due by 8/17/2015.(Hudson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 07/31 4:23 PM
MOTION REFERRED:24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Furnish Expert Witness Reports. (thb) |
||
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/24 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC. Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc. served on 7/22/2015, answer due 8/12/2015. (Williams, Christine) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/17 2:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc. (cmr) |
|
21 | 21
cmp
Third Party Complaint
Fri 07/17 2:09 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tetra Tech Tesoro, Inc., filed by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC.(Williams, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit SUMMONS | ||
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 07/14 4:32 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant shall have seven days from the date of this Order to file its amended document in accordance with the terms of this Order as a stand-alone entry on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/15/2015. (thb) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 07/14 4:34 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Third-party amended complaint due by 7/21/2015. (thb) |
||
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/19 12:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC. Responses due by 7/6/2015.(Williams, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 06/19 1:02 PM
MOTION REFERRED:19 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. (thb) |
||
Thursday, June 11, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/11 4:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2015. Discovery due by 10/21/2015. Motions due by 11/20/2015. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 8/9/2015. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 9/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/11/15. (cmr) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Protective Order
Thu 05/28 11:55 AM
ORDER granting Joint Motion for Confidentiality and PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/28/2015. (thb) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Protective Order
Tue 05/26 10:04 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Tetra Tech, Inc.. Responses due by 6/12/2015.(Hudson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 05/26 10:02 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hudson, David) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 05/26 10:12 AM
MOTION REFERRED:16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (thb) |
||
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Fri 05/15 11:36 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Wyatt B. Durrette, JR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/15/2015. (thb) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Fri 05/15 11:33 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christine A. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/15/2015. (thb) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/14 2:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christine A. Williams Receipt Number 113J-1786075, Fee Amount $200, by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC. Responses due by 6/1/2015.(Nicholson, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/14 2:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wyatt B. Durrette Jr. Receipt Number 113J-1786069, Fee Amount $200, by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC. Responses due by 6/1/2015.(Nicholson, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 05/14 3:30 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Wyatt B. Durrette Jr., 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christine A. Williams. (thb) |
||
Tuesday, May 12, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 05/12 2:30 PM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant by Tetra Tech, Inc..(Hudson, David) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Litigants' Bill of Rights
Tue 05/12 2:00 PM
Litigants' Bill of Rights by Tetra Tech, Inc., Tetra Tech, Inc.. (Hudson, David) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1
Tue 05/12 1:58 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Tetra Tech, Inc., Tetra Tech, Inc.. (Hudson, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Litigants' Bill of Rights
Tue 04/28 1:55 PM
Litigants' Bill of Rights by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC. (Nicholson, Sam) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Litigants' Bill of Rights
Tue 04/28 1:44 PM
Litigants' Bill of Rights by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC. (Nicholson, Sam) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 04/21 2:56 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Tetra Tech, Inc. by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC.(Nicholson, Sam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Whitelaw Wedge project | ||
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1
Tue 04/14 2:47 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC. (Nicholson, Sam) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 04/14 2:15 PM
RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER FOR REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/14/2015. (thb) |
|
Att: 1 Blank forms for new civil case filings | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other) Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/14 1:49 PM
NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/28/2015. (thb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/14 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JAAAT Technical Services, LLC from Superior Court of Richmond County State of GA, case number 2015RCCV144. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113J-1768845)(thb) (thb). Modified on 4/14/2015 (thb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 4 (4/14/2015) Signed page for Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 5 (4/14/2015) Signed page for the certificate of service, | ||
Att: 6 (4/14/2015) Signed Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/14 2:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Litigants' Bill of Rights due by 4/28/2015. (thb) |