Gojo Industries, Inc. v. Innovative Biodefense, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-02946 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 12, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 12, 2015 7:58 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Innovative Biodefense, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Gojo Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Innovative Biodefense, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gojo Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Aquarius Global Energy Partners, LLC
Terminated: 04/24/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |