Ariel Premium Supply, Inc. v. ANGA Supply, LLC
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Audrey G Fleissig |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-00633 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 13, 2015 7:51 AM CDT |
Defendant
ANGA Supply, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ariel Premium Supply, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment - Consent (Case)
Tue 01/19 1:35 PM
JUDGMENT... Upon consideration of the Agreement filed by the parties and for good cause appearing therefrom, it is ORDERED: 1. Anga shall not sell any of the Accused Products. 2. The parties shall not take any action to enforce this Consent Order on any claim for violation of this Consent Order unless and until the parties fail to resolve the dispute both by reasonable and good faith negotiation between the parties and by mediation. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/19/2016. (NEB) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Response to Court
Thu 01/14 5:27 PM
RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re23 ADR Compliance Report,24 Order, Proposed Order and Judgment by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc.. (Billick, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Tue 12/15 4:22 PM
ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file, on or before January 14, 2016, dismissal papers dismissing the case. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the case by the Court. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 1/14/2016.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/15/2015. (NEB) |
|
23 | 23
adr
ADR Compliance Report
Tue 12/15 11:03 AM
ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Sher, Richard P.. Date of Conference: December 14, 2015. The parties participated in good faith. The parties achieved a settlement.(Sher, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Designation of Neutral and ADR Conference Report
Tue 10/13 9:24 PM
Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc. Neutral: Sher, Richard P. Date of Conference: December 14, 2015 time: 10:00am Location: Offices of the Neutral(Whitaker, John) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Referring Case to ADR
Mon 09/21 1:37 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: John E. Whitaker. ADR Completion Deadline due by 11/20/2015. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 12/4/2015. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 10/13/2015. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on September 21, 2015. (BRP) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Case Management Order
Fri 07/10 4:10 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Motion to Join Parties due by 8/10/2015. Discovery Completion due by 4/11/2016. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2016. ADR Future Reference 9/21/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 5/9/2016. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Pretrial Compliance due by 9/21/2016. Motion in Limine due by 10/4/2016. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on July 10, 2015. (BRP) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Joint Scheduling Plan
Thu 07/02 6:19 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc.. . (Whitaker, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 06/30 10:11 AM
Docket Text ORDER Re:17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timithy Billick by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 30, 2015. (SAA) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/29 2:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timithy Billick. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached FROM THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON .(Filing fee $100 receipt number 50809) by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc..(JWJ) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
misc
Receipt
Sun 06/28 4:17 AM
Receipt 4644050809 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Timothy J. Billick (CCAM) |
||
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Rule 16 Order
Thu 06/25 3:28 PM
RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track 3 Complex. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/2/2015. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/10/2015 01:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 25, 2015. (BRP) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Thu 06/25 3:13 PM
ORDER: On May 19, 2015, this Court entered its Order setting the case for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. However, the Court inadvertently issued its order for non-patent cases. Accordingly, by this Order the Court is amending the Scheduling Order to substitute the scheduling requirements regarding patent cases. The scheduling conference shall remain on July 10, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on July 25, 2015. (BRP) |
|
14 | 14
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 06/25 3:01 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Whitaker by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc.; and12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip Mann by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 25, 2015. (SAA) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/24 3:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Whitaker by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 50753)(BRP) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/24 3:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip Mann by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 50753)(BRP) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
misc
Receipt
Wed 06/24 4:26 AM
Receipt 4644050753 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of John Whitaker (CCAM) |
||
misc
Receipt
Wed 06/24 4:26 AM
Receipt 4644050753 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Philip P. Mann (CCAM) |
||
Tuesday, May 19, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Rule 16 Order
Wed 05/20 11:55 AM
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/2/2015. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/10/2015 01:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (See Order for Complete Details) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/19/2015. (NEB) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 05/18 8:12 AM
Docket Text ORDER Re:6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice X. Young Lai by Defendant ANGA Supply, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 18, 2015. (SAA) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
A Docket Text Order
Fri 05/15 9:08 AM
Docket Text ORDER Re:7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alice W. Lee by Defendant ANGA Supply, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 15, 2015. (SAA) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
misc
Receipt
Fri 05/15 4:44 AM
Receipt 4644049969 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Xiaoyng Lai (CCAM) |
||
misc
Receipt
Fri 05/15 4:44 AM
Receipt 4644049970 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Alice Weiching Lee (CCAM) |
||
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/20 1:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ariel Premium Supply, Inc.. ANGA Supply, LLC served on 4/18/2015, answer due 5/11/2015. (Cornfeld, Richard) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Fri 04/17 8:53 AM
REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (BAK) |
|
misc
Case Opening Notification
Fri 04/17 8:49 AM
Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard S. Cornfeld. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK) |
||
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure of Corporation Interests
Thu 04/16 2:29 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Cornfeld, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
service
Notice of Process Server
Thu 04/16 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ariel Premium Supply, Inc. (Cornfeld, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/16 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant ANGA Supply, LLC with receipt number 0865-4823202, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Ariel Premium Supply, Inc..(Cornfeld, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons |