Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Leon Holmes
Case #: 4:15-cv-00219
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2015
Terminated:Jan 18, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 14, 2015 10:53 AM CDT
Defendant
DCG/UGOC Equity Fund LLC
Represented By
Tamar S. Wise
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Chad W. Pekron
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Robert Ryan Younger
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Michael B. de Leeuw
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
DCG Funds Managment LLC
Represented By
Tamar S. Wise
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Chad W. Pekron
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Robert Ryan Younger
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Michael B. de Leeuw
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
DCG/UGOC Equity Fund
Defendant
DCG/UGOC Funds Management LLC
Represented By
Tamar S. Wise
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Chad W. Pekron
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Robert Ryan Younger
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Michael B. de Leeuw
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
Edgar R Page
Represented By
Kevin A. Crass
Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pageone Financial Inc
Represented By
Kevin A. Crass
Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP
contact info
Defendant
United Group of Companies Inc
Represented By
Tamar S. Wise
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Chad W. Pekron
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Robert Ryan Younger
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Michael B. de Leeuw
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Most Worshipful Grand Lodge of Free and Accepted Masons of the State of Arkansas
Represented By
Marjorie E. Rogers
Hilburn, Calhoon, Harper, Pruniski & Calhoun, Ltd.
contact info
Lauren Lauren Hoover
Hilburn, Calhoon, Harper, Pruniski & Calhoun, Ltd.
contact info
John E. Pruniski, III
Hilburn, Calhoon, Harper, Pruniski & Calhoun, Ltd.
contact info
Lauren Hamilton
Hilburn, Calhoon, Harper, Pruniski & Calhoun, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/22/2017 11:59 PM CST
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
111 111 order Judgment Wed 11:47 AM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Opinions and Orders dismissing the claims of the plaintiff and granting summary judgment in favor of the defendants, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/18/2017. (ljb)
Related: [-]
110 110 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 11:43 AM
OPINION AND ORDER granting the defendants'101 motion for summary judgment or in the alternative motion for judgment on the pleadings. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/18/2017. (ljb)
Related: [-]