Besteder v. Alshohati
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Steele |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00220 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Prohibition of discrimination by public accommodations |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 20, 2015 10:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
Southend, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Beulah Besteder
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sadik Alshohati
Terminated: 08/25/2015
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/17 11:18 AM
ORDER granting the19 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/17/2016. (tgw) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/12 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Beulah Besteder (Sutton, John) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Fri 08/12 4:05 PM
REFERRAL OF19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge Steele. (tgw) |
||
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 08/03 4:04 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 8/17/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/3/2016. (srd) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order - Document NOTED
Mon 08/31 9:16 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Response to Order to Show Cause14 filed by Beulah Besteder. (Steele, William) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/26 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Southend, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tgw) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Wed 08/26 9:46 AM
REFERRAL OF14 Response to Order to Show Cause to Judge Steele. (tgw) |
||
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/25 1:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Beulah Besteder against c/o Sadik Alshohati Southend, LLC, filed by Beulah Besteder. (Sutton, John) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
14 | 14
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 08/25 1:33 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:13 Order to Show Cause filed by Beulah Besteder. (Sutton, John) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/17 11:04 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The plaintiff is ordered to show cause, by 8/31/2015, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/17/2015. copies to parties. (sdb) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 08/12 2:54 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:11 Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions,,, filed by Beulah Besteder. (Sutton, John) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Wed 08/12 3:11 PM
REFERRAL OF12 Response to Order to Show Cause to Judge Steele. (tgw) |
||
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 08/03 11:50 AM
Order denying9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sadik Alshohati filed by Beulah Besteder. Plaintiff is ordered to Show Cause by 8/24/2015 why this action should not be dismissed for failure to name a proper defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/3/2015. (tgw) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Case Transferred
Thu 06/18 10:42 AM
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge William H. Steele. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mjn) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 06/18 10:43 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, Sadik Alshohati; Referred to Judge William H. Steele. (mjn) |
||
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 06/17 9:14 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, Sadik Alshohati, by Beulah Besteder. (Sutton, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 06/15 5:00 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sadik Alshohati for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mjn) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default
Mon 06/01 12:33 PM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against Sadik Alshohati . (Sutton, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 05/05 9:20 AM
Return of Service Executed Sadik Alshohati served on 5/1/2015 by certified mail return receipt, answer due 5/22/2015. (mjn) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/23 4:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Sadik Alshohati.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Clerk issued summons by certified mail, return receipt; #7000 0520 0021 2473 0601 (mjn) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/23 2:39 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/23/2015. (Bivins, Sonja) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/23 9:41 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Beulah Besteder. (Sutton, John) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/23 9:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Beulah Besteder. (Sutton, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/23 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT Beaulah Besteder against Sadik Alshohati ( IFP.), filed by Beulah Besteder. (Sutton, John) (mjn) |
|
Att: 1 (4/23/2015) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 04/23 2:12 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mjn) |