SAVE JOBS USA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00615 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2016 |
Case in other court: | 16-05287 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 20, 2015 11:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SAVE JOBS USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 04/27 12:38 PM
USCA Case Number 23-5089 for87 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by SAVE JOBS USA. (znmw) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
88 | 88
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 04/25 3:22 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re87 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zjm) |
|
87 | 87
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Tue 04/25 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to86 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,85 Memorandum & Opinion by SAVE JOBS USA. Fee Status: Paid, $505, Receipt No. ADCDC-10023495) Parties have been notified. (Miano, John) Modified on 4/25/2023 to add in payment information.(ztnr) |