Bermuda Road Properties, LLC v. D3DS CSD LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00783 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 24, 2015 10:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
D3DS CSD LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Ecological Steel Systems, Inc., d/b/a EcoSteel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bermuda Road Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 17, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief
Mon 08/17 2:54 PM
BRIEF filed by Interested Party Ecological Steel Systems, Inc., d/b/a EcoSteel. Brief Submitted Per Order to Show Cause (#116) in Case No. 2:12-cv-1579-JAD-GWF (Faux, Jordan) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Errata
Mon 08/10 6:01 PM
ERRATA to8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal ; filed by Plaintiff Bermuda Road Properties, LLC. (Balkenbush, Colby) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/10 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Bermuda Road Properties, LLC. Without Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i)(Balkenbush, Colby) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 06/29 5:08 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Bermuda Road Properties, LLC . (Balkenbush, Colby) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/16 8:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bermuda Road Properties, LLC re1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued. D3DS CSD LLC served on 6/15/2015, answer due 7/6/2015. (Balkenbush, Colby) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 05/06 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bermuda Road Properties, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent LVNV Holdings, LLC for Bermuda Road Properties, LLC added. . (Balkenbush, Colby) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Wed 04/29 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 4/29/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag & Gen Order 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Tue 04/28 8:27 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (DKJ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/28 8:26 AM
Summons Issued as to D3DS CSD LLC re1 Complaint,. (DKJ) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/27 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against D3DS CSD LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3643701), filed by Bermuda Road Properties, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/7/2015. Proof of service due by 8/25/2015. (Balkenbush, Colby) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 04/28 8:24 AM
Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ) |