Ellis vs. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (PLR2)
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | H Bruce Guyton |
Referred: | H Bruce Guyton |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00186 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2016 |
Defendant
Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Office of General Counsel - 2014 and 2015
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul W. Ellis
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Thu 03/31 8:40 AM
ORDER: For reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion entered contemporaneously herewith, the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 16 ] is DENIED, and the Commissioner's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 18 ] is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES this action and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/31/16. (JBR) |
|
21 | 21
18
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Thu 03/31 8:33 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION: It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 16 ] be DENIED, and the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 18 ] be GRANTED. The Clerk of Court will be directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/31/16. (JBR) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Consent to Magistrate and Order of Reference
Thu 02/18 10:48 AM
CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/18/16. (JBR) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 01/04 6:45 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Harber, Loretta) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 01/04 6:44 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Harber, Loretta) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 11/18 10:43 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul W. Ellis. (Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 11/18 10:41 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paul W. Ellis. (Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 10/23 8:52 AM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Based upon the lack of opposition from the Defendant, Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 18, 2015, in which to file his dispositive motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/23/2015. (This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry.) (DPG) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 10/19 8:31 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File MSJ and Memo in Support by Paul W. Ellis. (Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
Monday, October 12, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Consent/Nonconsent
Mon 10/12 7:55 AM
NOTICE OF CONSENT by Paul W. Ellis (Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Setting SSA Briefing Schedule
Wed 09/09 8:55 AM
Order Setting SSA Briefing Schedule. Social Security Briefing Schedule DDL set for 12/8/2015 . Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/9/15. (JBR) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge
Wed 09/09 8:53 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/9/15. (JBR) |
|
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent | ||
misc
Public Docket Annotation
Wed 09/09 4:04 PM
Courtesy Copy of Transcript Received in the Clerk's Office. (JBR) |
||
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Transcript - Social Security
Tue 09/08 4:16 PM
TRANSCRIPT (Complete Certified Administrative Record) by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Harber, Loretta) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/08 4:14 PM
NOTICE by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Notice of Manual Filing - Transcript of the Administrative Record) (Harber, Loretta) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/08 4:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of.(Harber, Loretta) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 07/27 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul W. Ellis. SSA Office of General Counsel - 2014 and 2015 served on 7/13/2015. (Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 07/27 3:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul W. Ellis. SSA Office of General Counsel - 2014 and 2015 served on 7/8/2015. (Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 07/27 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul W. Ellis. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 7/27/2015. (Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 05/11 9:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (JBR) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued - US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Issued - USA | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 05/11 9:30 AM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 5/8/15. (JBR) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)
Wed 04/29 10:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Ward Ellis. (Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - SSA
Wed 04/29 10:37 AM
SSA COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Paul Ward Ellis.(Drozdowski, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Office Regional Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Summons US Attorney Knoxville, | ||
Att: 3 Summons US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 4 Other SS # Page, | ||
Att: 5 Other Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/29 2:11 PM
District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (LMC) |