J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Leigh Martin May |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01434 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:551 Cable Communications Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 27, 2015 11:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
H&H Hospitality, Inc.
Terminated: 06/03/2015
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
utility
Final Exhibit Disposition
Thu 02/09 10:19 AM
PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS DESTROYED as directed in21 Exhibit Return Notification,22 Exhibit Disposition Notification (mec) |
||
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Exhibit Disposition Notification
Thu 08/18 10:09 AM
NOTICE TO COURT regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D(2) filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Exhibits to be Destroyed.. |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Exhibit Return Notification
Wed 08/17 2:46 PM
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL OF RECORD regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED EXHIBITS (Damages Hearing - August 26, 2015) pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D(2). (mec) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certified Mail Returned Receipt
Thu 10/01 2:40 PM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt re Writ mailed to Ronald Reemsnyder. (ddm) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 09/29 11:42 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. re12 Order,13 Clerk's Judgment returned via USPS marked "Return to Sender". (ddm) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
order
Writ Issued
Thu 09/17 10:19 AM
WRIT of of Execution issued in the amount of $42,850.00 and 594.01. Original returned to Ronald Reemsnyder via certified mail # 91 7199 9991 7032 5719 6655. (ddm) |
||
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Application for Writ
Wed 09/16 1:42 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Execution by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Writ of Execution | ||
Tuesday, September 15, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Costs Taxed
Tue 09/15 12:45 PM
Costs Taxed in amount of $ 594.01 against Defendant K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. (ddm) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 09/02 10:30 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. re NEF Clerks Entry of Default returned via USPS marked "Return to Sender, Recipient No Longer At This Address". (ddm) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Bill of Costs
Thu 08/27 1:58 PM
BILL OF COSTS by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
trial
Exhibits
Wed 08/26 4:00 PM
EXHIBITS (Plaintiff's Exhibit 1) admitted and retained at the11 8/26/15 Damages Hearing before LMM have been received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in Exhibit room. (ddm) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 08/26 2:47 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc. and against Defendant Against Defendant K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. in the amount of $42,850.00 plus costs. (ddm) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 08/26 2:46 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant K.Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/26/15. (ddm) |
|
11 | 11
minutes
Damages Hearing
Wed 08/26 2:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Damages Hearing held on 8/26/2015 on Plaintiff's10 Motion for Default Judgment against K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. The Court heard from Plaintiff's counsel regarding damages and attorney fees sought. Plaintiff's counsel submitted his attorney fees invoice which the Court admitted as Plaintiff's exhibit 1. A written order will be issued. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(ddm) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/26 2:48 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. re12 Order,13 Clerk's Judgment. (ddm) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 08/26 2:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) |
||
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 07/29 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Damages Hearing set for 8/26/2015 at 09:30AM in ATLA Courtroom 2107 before Judge Leigh Martin May. (rvb) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/29 9:59 AM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. re Clerks Entry of Default, Notice of Hearing (rvb) |
||
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Mon 07/27 12:17 PM
Submission of10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. d/b/a Cafe Circa , submitted to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (ddm) |
||
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 07/07 10:43 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. d/b/a Cafe Circa with Brief In Support by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Ronald D. Reemsnyder in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law Supporting Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment | ||
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 06/16 9:53 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Clerk's Entry of Default | ||
utility
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 06/16 10:02 AM
Clerks Entry of Default as to K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. (ddm) |
||
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 06/15 3:47 PM
Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc. served on 5/21/2015, answer due 6/11/2015. |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2015 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Wed 06/03 2:50 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, with Prejudice, as to H&H Hospitality, Inc. d/b/a Cafe Circa pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (ddm) |
||
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 06/02 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to H&H Hospitality, Inc. d/b/a Cafe Circa filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. |
|
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Return of Service Unexecuted
Mon 05/18 9:14 AM
Return of Service Unexecuted by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. as to K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc.. |
|
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 05/18 9:13 AM
Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. H&H Hospitality, Inc. served on 5/10/2015, answer due 6/1/2015. |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Fri 05/01 2:21 PM
STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation in cases proceeding before Judge May. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/1/15. (ddm) |
|
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Fri 05/01 9:43 AM
Clerks Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) |
||
Thursday, April 30, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 04/30 2:20 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (fap) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 04/30 2:19 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to H&H Hospitality, Inc., K. Christopher Edwards and Company, Inc.(fap) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/30 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. and summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-5797418.)(fap) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |