Dudley v. Corizon Medical Services et al (INMATE 2)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Referred: | Gray M Borden |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00287 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2018 |
Defendant
Alabama Department of Corrections
|
|
Defendant
Corizon Medical Services
|
|
Defendant
Lt. Tate
|
|
Defendant
Nurse Long
|
|
Defendant
Sgt. Calvin
|
|
Defendant
Staton Correctional Facility
|
|
Interested Party
Staff Attorneys
|
|
Plaintiff
John Patrick Dudley
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Judgment Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 08/30 8:21 AM
JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: 1) The US Magistrate Judge's 34 recommendation is adopted; 2) Dfts' 21 motion for summary judgment is granted; 3) Judgment is entered in favor of dfts and against plf, with plf taking nothing by his complaint; further ORDERED that costs are taxed against plf, for which execution may issue; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/30/2018.(alm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thu 08/30 8:17 AM
OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/30/2018. (alm, ) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 08/06 8:17 AM
No objections filed to the34 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) |
||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/17 1:59 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) Dfts' 21 motion for summary judgment be GRANTED; 2) Judgment be GRANTED in favor of Dfts; 3) This case be DISMISSED with prejudice; 4) The costs of this proceeding be taxed against Plf; Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 7/17/2018. (alm, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 06/20 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by John Patrick Dudley. (alm, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 01/31 4:10 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by John Patrick Dudley re31 Order to Show Cause. (alm, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 01/31 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by John Patrick Dudley. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc32 for pdf) (alm, ) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 01/25 10:14 AM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to mail a copy of this order to Plf at his last known address of record; further DIRECTING the Clerk to mail a copy of this order to Plf at the Easterling Correctional Facility; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plf why this case should not be dismissed for his failures to comply with the orders of this court and to adequately prosecute this action; Show Cause Response due by 2/5/2018; Copies mailed to Plf as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 1/25/2018. (alm, ) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 03/17 2:54 PM
Partial Filing fee received: $ 49.40, receipt number 4602044621. (wcl, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 03/01 1:21 PM
Partial Filing fee received: $ 72.00, receipt number 4602044349. (wcl, ) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 07/14 8:45 AM
ORDERED that the motion to amend (Doc. #26 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff may, however, file a new civil complaint regarding the matters alleged in his June 30, 2016, pleading. The Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish Plaintiff with a form for use in filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 action along with a form for use in requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 7/14/2016. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Wed 07/13 2:57 PM
ORDER denying as moot26 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order; This case is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/13/2016. (wcl, ) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Amend/Correct Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 06/30 4:43 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by John Patrick Dudley.(wcl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 07/08 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by John Patrick Dudley. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc26 for pdf) (wcl, ) |
||
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 04/01 7:55 AM
Partial Filing fee received: $ 35.00, receipt number 4602040588 (kh, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 03/08 12:30 PM
Partial Filing fee received: $ 80.00, receipt number 4602040357 (kh, ) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/30 8:56 AM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Gray Michael Borden. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, ) |
||
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Response in Opposition
Thu 10/08 4:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint, by John Patrick Dudley. (kh, ) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Thu 09/17 11:18 AM
ORDERED that on or before October 8, 2015, Plaintiff shall file a response to the21 written report, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/17/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint
Wed 09/16 4:38 PM
Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Sgt. Calvin, Lt. Tate.(Jessip, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer
Thu 09/10 11:14 AM
ORDER ON MOTION that: 1. Defendants'19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer is GRANTED; and 2. Defendants are GRANTED an extension from 9/9/2015, to and including 9/16/2015, to file their answer and written report. Special Report & Answer due from Sgt. Calvin on 9/16/2015; Lt. Tate on 9/16/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 9/10/2015. (dmn, ) |
|
utility
AO FORM 85
Thu 09/10 7:25 AM
AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Sgt. Calvin, Lt. Tate. (dmn, )(NO PDF) |
||
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer
Wed 09/09 2:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer re12 Order to file special report within 40 days of the date of this order, by Sgt. Calvin, Lt. Tate. (Jessip, Katherine) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/09 2:43 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sgt. Calvin, Lt. Tate. (Jessip, Katherine) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/09 2:42 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Sgt. Calvin, Lt. Tate.(Jessip, Katherine) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/26 2:29 PM
JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's13 recommendation is adopted. (2) Plaintiffs claims against defendants Alabama Department of Corrections and Staton Correctional Facility are dismissed with prejudice, and defendants Alabama Department of Corrections and Staton Correctional Facility are terminated as parties to this action. (3) This case is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/26/2015.(kh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Wed 08/26 2:13 PM
OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/26/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
service
Return Receipt Card
Tue 08/04 2:25 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Complaint and12 order signed by Lisa Merkerson for Sgt. Calvin served on 7/31/2015, answer due 9/9/2015; Lt. Tate served on 7/31/2015, answer due 9/9/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/29 2:29 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. Plaintiff's § 1983 claims against Defendants the Alabama Department of Corrections and the Staton Correctional be DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i);2. The Alabama Department of Corrections and the Staton Correctional Facility be DISMISSED with prejudice and terminated as parties prior to service ofprocess under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 3. This case be REFERRED to the undersigned for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 8/12/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/29/2015. (kh, ) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order to File Special Report
Wed 07/29 12:20 PM
ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT and ANSWER on or before September 9, 2015; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants Tate and Calvin, to General Counsel for the ADOC, and to the Attorney General for the State of AL. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/29/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 07/24 8:12 AM
Received partial Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 4602037702 (djy, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/22 11:35 AM
JUDGMENT that it is ORDERED as follows: (1) the9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (2) the court construes plf's7 Motion for leave to file and amended complaint as a motion to dismiss his claims regarding inadequate medical care against defs Corizon Medical Services and Long; (3) said7 Motion to Dismiss is granted; (4) Plf's claims against defs Corizon Medical Services and Long are dismissed without prejudice; (5) defs Corizon Medical services and Nurse Long are dismissed without prejudice and terminated as parties, with no costs taxed; (6) all of plf's other claims remain pending; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is referred back to the US Magistrate Judge for further proceedings; this case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/22/15.(djy, ) |
|
Att: 1 civil appeals checklist | ||
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 07/14 4:45 PM
NO OBJECTIONS filed to9 Recommendation. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) |
||
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendations Order
Wed 06/24 2:33 PM
ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. Plaintiff's 6/22/2015, pleading, considered a Motion to Dismiss his complaint regarding inadequate medical care against Defendants Long and Corizon Medical Services (Doc. No.7 ), be GRANTED; 2. Plaintiffs complaint against Defendants Long and Corizon Medical Services regarding allegedly inadequate medical care be DISMISSED and Defendants Long and Corizon Medical Services be DISMISSED as parties to this complaint; 3. The complaint, regarding Plaintiffs failure to protect from an inmate assault claim against the remaining defendants, be REFERRED to the undersigned for additional proceedings. In light of the foregoing, it is ORDERED that the courts 6/15/2015, order (Doc. No.5 ) is WITHDRAWN. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 6/24/2015. (dmn, ) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 06/24 2:25 PM
ORDER ON MOTION that Plaintiff's6 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 6/24/2015. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 06/22 4:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Amend1 Inmate 1983 Complaint by John Patrick Dudley. (dmn, ) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 06/22 4:24 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by John Patrick Dudley. (dmn, ) |
|
motion
Dismiss
Wed 06/24 2:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint regarding inadequate medical care against Defendants Long and Corizon Medical Services by John Patrick Dudley. (dmn, ) (NO PDF attached, see Doc.7 for pdf.) |
||
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Mon 06/15 2:32 PM
ORDERED that on or before June 29, 2015, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/15/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 06/12 1:27 PM
Initial Filing fee: $ 73.60, receipt number 4602037172 (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Fri 05/01 4:27 PM
ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $46.40 be paid on or before May 22, 2015; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Staton Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/1/2015. (kh, ) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit
Fri 05/01 8:30 AM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by John Patrick Dudley. (ajw, Amanda) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Inmate 1983 Complaint
Fri 05/01 8:28 AM
Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Sgt. Calvin, Corizon Medical Services, Nurse Long, Staton Correctional Facility, Lt. Tate, filed by John Patrick Dudley.(ajw, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |